Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1086732

EP1086732 - System for profiling mobile station activity in a predictive command wireless game system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  18.10.2013
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2013Refusal of applicationpublished on 20.11.2013  [2013/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
[2001/13]
Inventor(s)01 / Schulz, Paul David
9/29 Waruda Street
Kirribilli, New South Wales 2061 / AU
02 / Sinclair, Matthew Frazer
2/10 Holdsworth Street
Neural Bay, New South Wales 2089 / AU
03 / Larsen, Kenneth Bo
38 Canwar Avenue
Carrs Park, New South Wales 2221 / AU
 [2001/13]
Representative(s)Swindell & Pearson Limited
48 Friar Gate
Derby DE1 1GY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/36]Swindell & Pearson
48 Friar Gate Derby
Derbyshire DE1 1GY / GB
Former [2004/13]Simmelvuo, Markku , et al
Papula Oy, Patent Agency Papula P.O. Box 981
00101 Helsinki / FI
Former [2001/13]Johansson, Folke Anders
Nokia Corporation, P.O. Box 319
00045 Nokia Group / FI
Application number, filing date00660161.120.09.2000
[2001/13]
Priority number, dateUS1999040475924.09.1999         Original published format: US 404759
[2001/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1086732
Date:28.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:A63F13/12, H04L29/06
[2001/13]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/13]
TitleGerman:System für Profilbestimmung der Mobil-Stationsaktivität in einem Spiel mit prädiktiven Steuerungsbefehlen[2001/13]
English:System for profiling mobile station activity in a predictive command wireless game system[2001/13]
French:Système pour la définition d'un profil d'activité d'une station mobile dans un jeu à commandes predictives[2001/13]
Examination procedure28.09.2001Examination requested  [2001/48]
19.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.02.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.08.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.02.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.2010Date of oral proceedings
09.11.2010Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
10.11.2010Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/47]
28.06.2013Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/47]
Appeal following examination10.01.2011Appeal received No.  T0594/11
04.03.2011Statement of grounds filed
28.06.2013Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
28.06.2013Date of oral proceedings
05.07.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.02.2004
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
11.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
12.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
11.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
14.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
29.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
12.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5809415  (ROSSMANN ALAIN) [X] 1-3,7,10-13,17,29,33,44 * column 3, line 25 - column 5, line 19 * * column 5, line 61 - column 6, line 67 * * column 8, line 18 - line 45 * * column 10, line 23 - line 65 * * column 11, line 48 - column 13, line 7 * * column 15, line 58 - column 16, line 10 * * column 17, line 50 - column 19, line 41 * * column 22, line 4 - column 23, line 33 * * column 27, line 26 - line 41 * * column 29, line 11 - column 30, line 42 * * column 39, line 40 - column 41, line 31 * [Y] 4-6,8,14-16,50,53,54,58,60;
 [Y]US5899810  (SMITH JOSHUA E) [Y] 4-6,8,14-16,50,53,54,58,60 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 14; claim 1 *;
 [A]WO9710561  (MICRO FORTE PTY LIMITED ;LEWIS STEPHEN (AU); MARGHERITI JOHN DE (A) [A] 1,10,29,50 * page 3, line 1 - page 5, line 12; claim 1 *