Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1086732 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1086732



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 732
17.02.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
11.10.2013 Closing of application Search / examination 2
30.09.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
25.09.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
20.09.2013 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 16
20.09.2013 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
05.07.2013 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
05.07.2013 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
14.06.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
02.04.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
28.03.2013 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
28.03.2013 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 5
21.01.2013 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
10.06.2011 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
18.03.2011 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
09.03.2011 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
04.03.2011 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 7
04.03.2011 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 7
04.03.2011 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
04.03.2011 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
04.03.2011 Claims Appeal 6
04.03.2011 Claims Appeal 6
04.03.2011 Claims Appeal 7
04.03.2011 Claims Appeal 7
04.03.2011 Description Appeal 2
04.03.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
04.03.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
15.01.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
10.01.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
10.01.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
10.01.2011 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
16.11.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 2
16.11.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
10.11.2010 Annex to a communication Search / examination 14
10.11.2010 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
10.11.2010 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
10.11.2010 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 6
10.11.2010 Means of redress Search / examination 2
09.11.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
09.11.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
09.11.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
09.11.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
14.10.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
08.10.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
08.10.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
06.10.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
06.10.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 2
01.10.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
01.10.2010 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
01.10.2010 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
27.09.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
09.09.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
08.09.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
08.09.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
08.09.2010 Claims Search / examination 7
08.09.2010 Claims Search / examination 7
08.09.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
08.09.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 10
03.04.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 2
26.03.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
24.03.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
24.03.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
18.03.2010 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
04.08.2009 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.07.2009 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 3
14.02.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.02.2008 Claims Search / examination 9
14.02.2008 Claims Search / examination 11
14.02.2008 Description Search / examination 6
14.02.2008 Description Search / examination 5
14.02.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.02.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
21.12.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
18.12.2007 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.12.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.12.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.08.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
22.08.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.02.2007 Abstract Search / examination 1
23.02.2007 Abstract Search / examination 1
23.02.2007 Claims Search / examination 10
23.02.2007 Claims Search / examination 9
23.02.2007 Description Search / examination 31
23.02.2007 Description Search / examination 30
23.02.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
21.02.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 86
04.12.2006 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
28.11.2006 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.08.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
22.08.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.08.2004 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
07.06.2004 Claims Search / examination 11
07.06.2004 Claims Search / examination 8
07.06.2004 Description Search / examination 29
07.06.2004 Description Search / examination 29
07.06.2004 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.06.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
19.02.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
19.02.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.02.2004 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
02.02.2004 Request for change of representative Search / examination 3
14.12.2001 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
03.04.2001 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
23.02.2001 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
14.02.2001 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
17.01.2001 Drawings Search / examination 22
17.01.2001 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.12.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
14.12.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
14.12.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
29.09.2000 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
29.09.2000 Priority document Search / examination 93
20.09.2000 Abstract Search / examination 1
20.09.2000 Claims Search / examination 10
20.09.2000 Description Search / examination 29
20.09.2000 Drawings Search / examination 32
20.09.2000 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
20.09.2000 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8