Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1099492

EP1099492 - Automated collar-forming drill mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.02.2006
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2008Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 24.12.2008  [2008/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
T-DRILL OY
Pl 20
66401 Laihia / FI
[2001/20]
Inventor(s)01 / Letho, Pertti
Mekaanikontie 2
66400 Laihia / FI
02 / Haavisto, Kari
Vaasanpuistikko 1 D 1
65100 Vaasa / FI
03 / Ropponen, Vesa
Lauttakyläntie 540
31900 Punkalaidun / FI
04 / Saari, Timo
Parturintie 8
66400 Laihia / FI
 [2004/45]
Former [2001/20]01 / Letho, Pertti
Mekaanikontie 2
66400 Laihia / FI
02 / Haavisto, Kari
Vaasanpuitikko 1 D 1
65100 Vaasa / FI
03 / Ropponen, Vesa
Lauttakyläntie 540
31900 Punkalaidun / FI
04 / Saari, Timo
Parturintie 8
66400 Laihia / FI
Representative(s)LEITZINGER OY
Tammasaarenkatu 1
00180 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]LEITZINGER OY
Ruoholahdenkatu 8
00180 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date00660196.709.11.2000
[2001/20]
Priority number, dateFI1999000243712.11.1999         Original published format: FI 992437
[2001/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1099492
Date:16.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1099492
Date:06.02.2002
[2002/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1099492
Date:30.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.12.2001
ClassificationInternational:B21C37/29
[2001/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2001/20]
TitleGerman:Automatisierten Bohrmechanismus zum Formen von Aushalsungen[2001/20]
English:Automated collar-forming drill mechanism[2001/20]
French:Mécanisme de forage automatisé pour la formation de collerettes[2001/20]
Examination procedure06.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/41]
30.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.09.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.01.2005Fee for grant paid
27.01.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.01.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
01.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT30.03.2005
BE30.03.2005
CH30.03.2005
FI30.03.2005
FR30.03.2005
IT30.03.2005
LI30.03.2005
NL30.03.2005
TR30.03.2005
DK30.06.2005
GR30.06.2005
SE30.06.2005
DE01.07.2005
ES11.07.2005
PT07.09.2005
CY09.11.2005
GB09.11.2005
IE09.11.2005
LU30.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
[2008/52]
Former [2008/45]AT30.03.2005
BE30.03.2005
CH30.03.2005
FI30.03.2005
IT30.03.2005
LI30.03.2005
NL30.03.2005
TR30.03.2005
DK30.06.2005
GR30.06.2005
SE30.06.2005
DE01.07.2005
ES11.07.2005
PT07.09.2005
CY09.11.2005
GB09.11.2005
IE09.11.2005
FR30.11.2005
LU30.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
Former [2008/07]AT30.03.2005
BE30.03.2005
CH30.03.2005
FI30.03.2005
IT30.03.2005
LI30.03.2005
NL30.03.2005
TR30.03.2005
DK30.06.2005
GR30.06.2005
SE30.06.2005
DE01.07.2005
ES11.07.2005
PT07.09.2005
CY09.11.2005
GB09.11.2005
IE09.11.2005
LU30.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
Former [2007/35]AT30.03.2005
BE30.03.2005
CH30.03.2005
FI30.03.2005
IT30.03.2005
LI30.03.2005
NL30.03.2005
TR30.03.2005
DK30.06.2005
GR30.06.2005
DE01.07.2005
ES11.07.2005
PT07.09.2005
CY09.11.2005
GB09.11.2005
IE09.11.2005
LU30.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
Former [2007/20]AT30.03.2005
BE30.03.2005
CH30.03.2005
FI30.03.2005
LI30.03.2005
NL30.03.2005
TR30.03.2005
DK30.06.2005
GR30.06.2005
DE01.07.2005
ES11.07.2005
PT07.09.2005
CY09.11.2005
GB09.11.2005
IE09.11.2005
LU30.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
Former [2007/11]AT30.03.2005
BE30.03.2005
CH30.03.2005
FI30.03.2005
LI30.03.2005
NL30.03.2005
TR30.03.2005
DK30.06.2005
GR30.06.2005
DE01.07.2005
ES11.07.2005
PT07.09.2005
GB09.11.2005
IE09.11.2005
LU30.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
Former [2007/08]AT30.03.2005
BE30.03.2005
CH30.03.2005
FI30.03.2005
LI30.03.2005
NL30.03.2005
TR30.03.2005
DK30.06.2005
GR30.06.2005
DE01.07.2005
ES11.07.2005
PT07.09.2005
IE09.11.2005
LU30.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
Former [2006/51]AT30.03.2005
BE30.03.2005
CH30.03.2005
FI30.03.2005
LI30.03.2005
NL30.03.2005
TR30.03.2005
DK30.06.2005
GR30.06.2005
DE01.07.2005
ES11.07.2005
PT07.09.2005
IE09.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
Former [2006/48]AT30.03.2005
BE30.03.2005
CH30.03.2005
FI30.03.2005
LI30.03.2005
NL30.03.2005
DK30.06.2005
GR30.06.2005
DE01.07.2005
ES11.07.2005
PT07.09.2005
IE09.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
Former [2006/30]AT30.03.2005
BE30.03.2005
CH30.03.2005
FI30.03.2005
LI30.03.2005
NL30.03.2005
DK30.06.2005
GR30.06.2005
DE01.07.2005
ES11.07.2005
PT07.09.2005
MC30.11.2005
Former [2006/18]AT30.03.2005
BE30.03.2005
CH30.03.2005
FI30.03.2005
LI30.03.2005
NL30.03.2005
DK30.06.2005
GR30.06.2005
DE01.07.2005
ES11.07.2005
PT07.09.2005
Former [2006/14]AT30.03.2005
BE30.03.2005
CH30.03.2005
FI30.03.2005
LI30.03.2005
NL30.03.2005
DK30.06.2005
GR30.06.2005
ES11.07.2005
PT07.09.2005
Former [2006/13]AT30.03.2005
BE30.03.2005
FI30.03.2005
DK30.06.2005
Former [2005/51]AT30.03.2005
BE30.03.2005
FI30.03.2005
Former [2005/46]FI30.03.2005
Documents cited:Search[A]US4175413  (VAN GEFFEN JOHANNES A [NL]) [A] 1,4,6,8 * column 2, line 17 - column 3, line 3; figure -; claims 1,4 *;
 [A]US3884060  (LARIKKA LEO) [A] 1 * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 29; figure - *;
 [A]US2631480  (ROMINE PAUL W, et al) [A] 1-5 * column 4, line 4 - column 6, line 55; figure - *;
 [A]NL302693  (VAN DER WAARD) [A] 1-5,8 * page 5, line 24 - page 7, line 1 * * page 7, line 23 - page 8, line 10; figure - *