Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1107350 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2011 | B1 | EP1107350 | 11.09.2002 | A3 | EP1107350 | 13.06.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | FI19992580 | 01.12.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE523921T | 15.09.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | FI19992580 | 01.12.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI115333B | 15.04.2005 | B | FI19992580 | 02.06.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | FI19992580 | 01.12.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6501349 | 31.12.2002 | B2 | US2001002810 | 07.06.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FI19992580 | 01.12.1999 |