Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1107350

EP1107350 - Method and arrangement for fastening inner conductor of resonator structure [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.07.2012
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 13.11.2013  [2013/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Powerwave Finland Oy
Takatie 6
90440 Kempele / FI
[2011/36]
Former [2003/14]For all designated states
Remec Oy
Koskitie 10, P.O. Box 18
90500 Oulu / FI
Former [2001/24]For all designated states
ADC Telecommunications Oy
Koskitie 10
90550 Oulu / FI
Inventor(s)01 / Jokilehto, Pekka
Melatie 3
90520 Oulu / FI
02 / Suvanto, Tapio
Sauratie 1
91900 Liminka / FI
03 / Haapalahti, Teuvo
Kauppiaantie 22
90460 Oulunsalo / FI
 [2001/24]
Representative(s)Antila, Harri Jukka Tapani , et al
Kolster Oy Ab
P.O. Box 148
(Iso Roobertinkatu 23)
00121 Helsinki / FI
[2011/50]
Former [2011/36]Antila, Harri Jukka Tapani
Kolster Oy Ab P.O. Box 148 Iso Roobertinkatu 23
00121 Helsinki / FI
Former [2001/24]Antila, Harri Jukka Tapani
Kolster Oy Ab, P.O. Box 148, Iso Roobertinkatu 23
00121 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date00660219.730.11.2000
[2001/24]
Priority number, dateFI1999000258001.12.1999         Original published format: FI 992580
[2001/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1107350
Date:13.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1107350
Date:11.09.2002
[2002/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1107350
Date:07.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:H01P7/04, H01P11/00
[2001/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2001/24]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Anordnung zur Befestigung von einem Innenleiter einer Resonatorstruktur[2001/24]
English:Method and arrangement for fastening inner conductor of resonator structure[2001/24]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour la fixation d' un conducteur interne d'une structure de résonateur[2001/24]
Examination procedure04.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/14]
11.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.04.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.04.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.07.2011Fee for grant paid
12.07.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.10.2006
Opposition(s)11.06.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
19.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
23.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
23.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
21.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
20.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
23.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
23.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT07.09.2011
BE07.09.2011
CY07.09.2011
DK07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
NL07.09.2011
TR07.09.2011
CH30.11.2011
IE30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
LU30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
GR08.12.2011
ES18.12.2011
PT09.01.2012
[2013/46]
Former [2013/44]AT07.09.2011
BE07.09.2011
CY07.09.2011
DK07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
NL07.09.2011
TR07.09.2011
CH30.11.2011
IE30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
LU30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
GR08.12.2011
PT09.01.2012
Former [2013/25]AT07.09.2011
BE07.09.2011
CY07.09.2011
DK07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
NL07.09.2011
CH30.11.2011
IE30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
LU30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
GR08.12.2011
PT09.01.2012
Former [2012/47]AT07.09.2011
BE07.09.2011
CY07.09.2011
DK07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
NL07.09.2011
CH30.11.2011
IE30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
GR08.12.2011
PT09.01.2012
Former [2012/35]AT07.09.2011
BE07.09.2011
CY07.09.2011
DK07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
NL07.09.2011
CH30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
GR08.12.2011
PT09.01.2012
Former [2012/33]AT07.09.2011
BE07.09.2011
CY07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
NL07.09.2011
CH30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
GR08.12.2011
PT09.01.2012
Former [2012/29]AT07.09.2011
BE07.09.2011
CY07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
NL07.09.2011
MC30.11.2011
GR08.12.2011
PT09.01.2012
Former [2012/23]AT07.09.2011
BE07.09.2011
CY07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
NL07.09.2011
GR08.12.2011
PT09.01.2012
Former [2012/17]AT07.09.2011
BE07.09.2011
CY07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
GR08.12.2011
Former [2012/12]AT07.09.2011
CY07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
GR08.12.2011
Former [2012/11]AT07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
GR08.12.2011
Former [2012/10]FI07.09.2011
GR08.12.2011
Former [2012/09]FI07.09.2011
Documents cited:Search[DY]EP0533394  (LK PRODUCTS OY [FI]) [DY] 1,23 * column 4, lines 36-54; figure 6 *;
 [Y]NL106836C  (BURNDY CORP [US]) [Y] 1,23 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH08195607
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961129), vol. 1996, no. 11, [A] 1,23 * abstract *