blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1107018

EP1107018 - Method for synchronizing a receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.08.2016
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.08.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.09.2016  [2016/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karaportti 3
02610 Espoo / FI
[2015/32]
Former [2014/24]For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
Former [2002/11]For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Former [2001/24]For all designated states
NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD.
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / Kontola, Ilkka
Vanha Vaasantie 33
39160 Julkujärvi / FI
 [2001/24]
Representative(s)Berggren Oy
P.O. Box 16
Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A
00101 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2001/24]Pursiainen, Timo Pekka
Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy, Hermiankatu 6
33720 Tampere / FI
Application number, filing date00660222.107.12.2000
[2001/24]
Priority number, dateFI1999000265309.12.1999         Original published format: FI 992653
[2001/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1107018
Date:13.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1107018
Date:17.09.2003
[2003/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.08.2003
ClassificationIPC:G01S5/14, H04B1/707, H04L27/00
[2001/24]
CPC:
H04B1/70752 (EP,US); H04B1/7075 (KR); G01S19/24 (EP,US);
G01S19/29 (EP,US); G01S19/30 (EP,US); H04B1/7077 (EP,US);
H04L27/0014 (EP,US); G01S2205/008 (EP,US); H04B1/71052 (EP,US);
H04B2201/70715 (EP,US); H04L2027/0065 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2001/24]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Synchronisieren eines Empfängers[2001/24]
English:Method for synchronizing a receiver[2001/24]
French:Procédé pour synchroniser un récepteur[2001/24]
Examination procedure05.02.2004Examination requested  [2004/15]
13.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.04.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/36]
04.05.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/36]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.04.2005
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
15.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
13.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
11.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
15.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
11.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
12.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 14
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 15
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 16
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]  - BROWN T A ET AL, "Direct-sequence spread spectrum acquisition using transform domain processing", MILITARY COMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, 1993. MILCOM '93. CONFERENCE RECORD. COMMUNICATIONS ON THE MOVE., IEEE BOSTON, MA, USA 11-14 OCT. 1993, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19931011), ISBN 0-7803-0953-7, pages 1018 - 1022, XP010142785 [X] 1-31 * page 1019 - page 1020 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MILCOM.1993.408667
 [X]  - DAFFARA F ET AL, "Improved search algorithm for fast acquisition in a DSP-based GPS receiver", SIGNALS, SYSTEMS, AND ELECTRONICS, 1998. ISSSE 98. 1998 URSI INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON PISA, ITALY 29 SEPT.-2 OCT. 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19980929), ISBN 0-7803-4900-8, pages 310 - 314, XP010316818 [X] 32-35 * page 310, column R - page 312, column L, paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISSSE.1998.738089
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.