Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1130495

EP1130495 - Method and apparatus for downloading an application with a variable lifetime [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip01.09.2017Refusal of applicationpublished on 04.10.2017  [2017/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karaportti 3
02610 Espoo / FI
[2015/32]
Former [2014/24]For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
Former [2001/36]For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / Zilliacus, Martin
Kavallintie 4 A
02700 Kauniainen / FI
02 / Kaszonyi, Gabor
Haller u. 40 VII/95
1096 Budapest / HU
 [2001/36]
Representative(s)Papula Oy
P.O. Box 981
00101 Helsinki / FI
[2011/18]
Former [2004/13]Simmelvuo, Markku , et al
Papula Oy, Patent Agency Papula P.O. Box 981
00101 Helsinki / FI
Former [2001/36]Johansson, Folke Anders , et al
Nokia Corporation, P.O. Box 206
00045 Nokia Group / FI
Application number, filing date00660234.618.12.2000
[2001/36]
Priority number, dateUS1999047030322.12.1999         Original published format: US 470303
[2001/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1130495
Date:05.09.2001
Language:EN
[2001/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1130495
Date:04.01.2006
[2006/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.11.2005
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/00
[2001/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2001/36]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herunterladen einer Anwendung mit unterschiedlicher Laufzeit[2001/36]
English:Method and apparatus for downloading an application with a variable lifetime[2001/36]
French:Méthode et dispositif pour télécharger une application avec une durée de validité variable[2001/36]
Examination procedure04.07.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.07.2006Examination requested  [2006/33]
04.04.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.10.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.06.2011Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
22.09.2011Date of oral proceedings
01.12.2011Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/40]
01.12.2011Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
12.07.2017Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/40]
Appeal following examination01.02.2012Appeal received No.  T1098/12
05.04.2012Statement of grounds filed
12.07.2017Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
12.07.2017Date of oral proceedings
17.07.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.04.2007
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
15.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
13.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
11.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
15.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
11.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
12.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 14
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 15
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 16
12.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 17
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0778512  (SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC) [Y] 1-22 * abstract * * column 2, line 17 - line 43 * * column 4, line 48 - line 55 * * column 5, line 44 - column 6, line 26 * * column 8, line 14 - line 34 * * column 9, line 15 - line 46 * * column 11, line 6 - line 10 * * column 13, line 29 - line 41 *;
 [Y]JPH10143357  (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 1-22 * abstract *;
 [L]US6502124  (SHIMAKAWA TAKUYA ET AL) [L] * abstract * * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 40 * * column 4, line 33 - line 48 *;
 [A]WO9301550  (INFOLOGIC SOFTWARE, INC) [A] 1-22 * page 6, line 9 - page 9, line 5 *;
 [A]EP0836132  (HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9842098  (CRYPTOWORKS, INC) [A] 1-22 * page 32, line 21 - page 34, line 11 *