Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1130495 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1130495



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 535
28.08.2017 Closing of application Search / examination 2
22.08.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
17.08.2017 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
09.08.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 13
09.08.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
17.07.2017 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
17.07.2017 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 1
30.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
30.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
30.06.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
12.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.06.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
12.06.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
24.04.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
20.04.2017 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
13.04.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
13.04.2017 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 8
10.04.2017 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
04.04.2017 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
07.07.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
18.06.2015 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Appeal 58
13.05.2014 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
07.05.2014 Request for change of address - applicant Appeal 2
18.09.2012 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
16.05.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
20.04.2012 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
05.04.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.04.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
05.04.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
01.02.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
01.02.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
01.02.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
12.12.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
01.12.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
01.12.2011 Annex to a communication Search / examination 10
01.12.2011 Annex to a communication Search / examination 10
01.12.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
01.12.2011 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
01.12.2011 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
01.12.2011 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 11
01.12.2011 Means of redress Search / examination 2
01.12.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
01.12.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
01.12.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
09.09.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.09.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.09.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.09.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.09.2011 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
09.09.2011 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
07.09.2011 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
31.08.2011 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
22.08.2011 Claims Search / examination 5
22.08.2011 Claims Search / examination 5
22.08.2011 Claims Search / examination 5
22.08.2011 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 8
15.06.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
11.06.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
01.06.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
01.06.2011 Annex to a communication Search / examination 1
01.06.2011 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
01.06.2011 Annex to a communication Search / examination 15
01.06.2011 Annex to a communication Search / examination 19
01.06.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
01.06.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 13
01.06.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
01.06.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
01.06.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
01.06.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 1
01.06.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
31.03.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
18.03.2011 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
16.03.2011 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
28.02.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 57
28.02.2011 Claims Search / examination 5
28.02.2011 Claims Search / examination 5
28.02.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
28.02.2011 Claims Search / examination 5
28.02.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
28.02.2011 Claims Search / examination 2
28.02.2011 Claims Search / examination 5
28.02.2011 Claims Search / examination 6
28.02.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
28.02.2011 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 6
07.12.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
17.11.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
17.11.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
17.11.2010 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 1
17.11.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
28.07.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.07.2009 Annex Search / examination 6
28.07.2009 Claims Search / examination 5
28.07.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.07.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
18.03.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
18.03.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.10.2007 Annex Search / examination 6
06.10.2007 Annex Search / examination 2
06.10.2007 Claims Search / examination 4
06.10.2007 Description Search / examination 2
06.10.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
04.10.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 18
14.08.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
03.08.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.04.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
04.04.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.07.2006 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
06.07.2006 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
06.07.2006 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
06.07.2006 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.07.2006 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
09.01.2006 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
22.11.2005 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
22.11.2005 European search report Search / examination 2
25.08.2004 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
09.02.2004 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
02.02.2004 Request for change of representative Search / examination 3
14.12.2001 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
25.07.2001 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
23.02.2001 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
17.01.2001 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
17.01.2001 Priority document Search / examination 29
18.12.2000 Abstract Search / examination 1
18.12.2000 Claims Search / examination 4
18.12.2000 Description Search / examination 14
18.12.2000 Drawings Search / examination 4
18.12.2000 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6