Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1038751

EP1038751 - Railcar buffer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.10.2002
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.09.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 02.11.2006  [2006/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schwab Verkehrstechnik AG
Ebnatstrasse 150A
8207 Schaffhausen / CH
[2000/39]
Inventor(s)01 / Ziegler, Otto
Rebbergstrasse 166
8240 Thayngen / CH
[2000/39]
Representative(s)Rottmann, Maximilian
Rottmann, Zimmermann + Partner AG
Gartenstrasse 28 A
5400 Baden / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]Rottmann, Maximilian R.
c/o Rottmann, Zimmermann + Partner AG Glattalstrasse 37
8052 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date00810060.424.01.2000
[2000/39]
Priority number, dateDE199910768923.02.1999         Original published format: DE 19907689
[2000/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1038751
Date:27.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1038751
Date:12.12.2001
Language:DE
[2001/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:B61G11/18
[2000/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/39]
TitleGerman:Puffer für Schienenfahrzeuge[2000/39]
English:Railcar buffer[2000/39]
French:Tampon pour véhicules ferroviaires[2000/39]
Examination procedure08.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/01]
12.01.2001Observations by third parties
06.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.09.2001Fee for grant paid
20.09.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.09.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)13.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/49]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI12.12.2001
GR12.12.2001
IE12.12.2001
NL12.12.2001
LU24.01.2002
BE31.01.2002
CY31.01.2002
DK12.03.2002
PT12.03.2002
MC01.08.2002
[2006/44]
Former [2004/39]FI12.12.2001
GR12.12.2001
IE12.12.2001
NL12.12.2001
LU24.01.2002
BE31.01.2002
CY31.01.2002
DK12.03.2002
PT12.03.2002
Former [2004/10]FI12.12.2001
GR12.12.2001
IE12.12.2001
NL12.12.2001
BE31.01.2002
CY31.01.2002
DK12.03.2002
PT12.03.2002
Former [2003/48]FI12.12.2001
GR12.12.2001
IE12.12.2001
NL12.12.2001
BE31.01.2002
DK12.03.2002
PT12.03.2002
Former [2003/45]FI12.12.2001
GR12.12.2001
IE12.12.2001
NL12.12.2001
DK12.03.2002
PT12.03.2002
Former [2003/07]FI12.12.2001
GR12.12.2001
IE12.12.2001
NL12.12.2001
PT12.03.2002
Former [2002/49]FI12.12.2001
GR12.12.2001
IE12.12.2001
PT12.03.2002
Former [2002/48]FI12.12.2001
IE12.12.2001
PT12.03.2002
Former [2002/33]FI12.12.2001
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2657836  (RINGFEDER GMBH) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [AD]DE2657837  (RINGFEDER GMBH) [AD] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4175667  (DILLNER ARTHUR M [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [AP]DE19813335  (MANNESMANN REXROTH AG [DE]) [AP] 1 * the whole document *
ExaminationDE9307051U
otherDE9307051U