EP1050334 - Typhon mixer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARNOLD AG Industriestrasse 6105 Schachen LU / CH | [2000/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schürch, Ernst Gallus-Steiger-Str. 13 6233 Büron / CH | [2000/45] | Representative(s) | Arato, Laszlo Seebuchtstrasse 19 Postfach 41 6374 Buochs / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/45] | Arato, Laszlo Seebuchtstrasse 19, Postfach 41 6374 Buochs / CH | Application number, filing date | 00810089.3 | 02.02.2000 | [2000/45] | Priority number, date | CH19990000810 | 02.05.1999 Original published format: CH 81099 | [2000/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1050334 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B01F3/04, B01F15/00 | [2000/45] | CPC: |
C02F3/1284 (EP);
B01F23/233 (EP);
Y02W10/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/45] | Title | German: | Schraubenrührer | [2000/45] | English: | Typhon mixer | [2000/45] | French: | Agitateur à vis | [2000/45] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/51] | 28.09.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/51] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1457186 (WEINRICH HEINRICH DR ING) [A] 1,4 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE1278409 (WEINRICH HEINRICH DR ING) [A] 1,4 * figure -; claim - * |