Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1048767

EP1048767 - Linear shed multiphase loom and process for inserting weft in a linear shed multiphase loom [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.03.2007
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sultex AG
Joweid Zentrum
8630 Rüti / CH
[2003/13]
Former [2000/44]For all designated states
Sulzer Textil AG
Joweid Zentrum
8630 Rüti / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Peter, Hans
Farmerstrasse 6
8404 Winterthur / CH
02 / Bucher, Robert
deceased / CH
[2000/44]
Representative(s)Sulzer Management AG
Patentabteilung / 0067 Zürcherstrasse 14
8401 Winterthur / CH
[N/P]
Former [2008/31]Sulzer Management AG
Patentabteilung / 0067 Zürcherstrasse 12
8401 Winterthur / CH
Former [2000/44]Sulzer Management AG
KS/Patente/0007, Zürcherstrasse 12
8401 Winterthur / CH
Application number, filing date00810243.622.03.2000
[2000/44]
Priority number, dateEP1999081033321.04.1999         Original published format: EP 99810333
[2000/44]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1048767
Date:02.11.2000
Language:DE
[2000/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1048767
Date:30.05.2001
[2001/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1048767
Date:17.05.2006
Language:DE
[2006/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:D03D41/00
[2000/44]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   IT [2002/08]
Former [2000/44]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Reihenfachwebmaschine und Verfahren zum Eintrag eines Schussfadens in eine Reihenfachwebmaschine[2000/44]
English:Linear shed multiphase loom and process for inserting weft in a linear shed multiphase loom[2000/44]
French:Métier à tisser multiphasé à foule linéaire et procédé pour insérer le fil de trame dans un métier à tisser multiphasé à foule linéaire[2000/44]
Examination procedure02.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/01]
01.12.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
28.03.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
28.01.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.04.2004Fee for grant paid
30.04.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.02.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
08.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
15.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
09.01.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2002FR   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2002GB   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT17.05.2006
[2007/35]
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0685584  (RUETI AG MASCHF [CH]) [A] 1,9,13 * the whole document *;
 [AD]EP0433216  (SULZER AG [CH]) [AD] 1,9,13 * abstract *;
 [A]US5540261  (MCGINLEY THOMAS F [US])