Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1046681

EP1046681 - Hybrid pigments [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.09.2007
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.09.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.10.2007  [2007/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Clariant Finance (BVI) Limited
Citco Building, Wickhams Cay, P.O. Box 662
Road Town, Tortola / VG
[2000/43]
Inventor(s)01 / Kaul, Bansi Lal
Bruckackerstrasse 48
4105 Biel-Benken / CH
02 / Piastra, Bruno
12, rue Lavoisier
68330 Huningue / FR
03 / Plüg, Carsten
Bromenackerweg 2
79576 Weil am Rhein - Haltingen / DE
04 / Steffanut, Pascal
1, rue des Tilleuls
68000 Colmar / FR
05 / Born, Roland
13, rue de l'Eglise
68220 Leymen / FR
[2000/43]
Representative(s)Hütter, Klaus , et al
Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH
Patent Management
Industriepark Höchst, G 860
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/30]Hütter, Klaus, Dr. , et al
Clariant GmbH Patente, Marken, Lizenzen Am Unisys-Park 1
65843 Sulzbach / DE
Former [2000/43]D'haemer, Jan Constant , et al
Clariant International Ltd., Industrial Property Department, Rothausstrasse 61
4132 Muttenz / CH
Application number, filing date00810342.619.04.2000
[2000/43]
Priority number, dateGB1999000910522.04.1999         Original published format: GB 9909105
GB2000000566310.03.2000         Original published format: GB 0005663
[2000/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1046681
Date:25.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1046681
Date:12.02.2003
[2003/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1046681
Date:02.11.2006
Language:EN
[2006/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.01.2003
ClassificationInternational:C09B67/22, C09B19/02
[2003/07]
Former International [2000/43]C09B67/22
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2006/44]
Former [2000/43]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Hybride Pigmente[2000/43]
English:Hybrid pigments[2000/43]
French:Pigments hybrides[2000/43]
Examination procedure12.08.2003Examination requested  [2003/42]
16.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.04.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.08.2006Fee for grant paid
30.08.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.08.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
03.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
02.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
02.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO9832800  (CLARIANT FINANCE BVI LTD [CH], et al) [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * page 9, paragraph 3 *;
 [Y]EP0654506  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [Y] 1-11 * page 7, paragraph 1 *;
 [Y]EP0277914  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * page 4, line 31 - line 55 *;
 [Y]EP0889046  (CLARIANT FINANCE BVI LTD [VG]) [Y] 1-11 * abstract *;
 [D]DE19727079  (CLARIANT INT LTD [CH]);
 [YD]GB2284427  (SANDOZ LTD [CH]) [YD] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO9845756  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [PY]EP0945455  (CLARIANT FINANCE BVI LTD [VG]) [PY] 1-11 * the whole document *