Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1160612

EP1160612 - Conveyor for specimen slide [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.01.2003
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.03.2003  [2003/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sulzer Medica AG
Zürcherstrasse 12
8401 Winterthur / CH
[2001/49]
Inventor(s)01 / Frei, Heribert
Pfaffenwiesenstrasse 79
8404 Winterthur / CH
02 / Hildebrand, Steven
Felsenstrasse 96
9000 St. Gallen / CH
03 / Brunner, Andreas
Riethof
8425 Oberembrach / CH
04 / Tommasini, Roberto
Mattenweg 14
8610 Uster / CH
05 / Müller, Werner, Dr.
Wannenstrasse 6
8542 Wiesendangen / CH
 [2001/49]
Representative(s)Sulzer Management AG
Patentabteilung / 0067 Zürcherstrasse 14
8401 Winterthur / CH
[N/P]
Former [2001/49]Sulzer Management AG
KS/Patente/0007 Zürcherstrasse 12
8401 Winterthur / CH
Application number, filing date00810466.329.05.2000
[2001/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1160612
Date:05.12.2001
Language:DE
[2001/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:G02B21/34, B01L3/00
[2001/49]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2002/35]
Former [2001/49]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Transportvorrichtung für Objektträger[2001/49]
English:Conveyor for specimen slide[2001/49]
French:Convoyeur pour lame porte-objet[2001/49]
Examination procedure06.06.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/11]
08.10.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2003/11]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
16.07.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
16.07.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
16.07.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
16.07.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
16.07.2002DE   M01   Not yet paid
16.07.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
16.07.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
16.07.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
16.07.2002FR   M01   Not yet paid
16.07.2002GB   M01   Not yet paid
16.07.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
16.07.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
16.07.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
16.07.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
16.07.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
16.07.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
16.07.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
16.07.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
16.07.2002M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200203   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2940360  (CARTER JR WILLIAM H) [X] 1-5,8-10 * figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 18 - column 3, line 38 * [A] 6,7,11-13;
 [XA]US2942520  (ROSE GEORGE G) [X] 1-5,8-10,13 * figures 1-3 * * column 1, line 26 - column 3, line 58 * [A] 6,7,11,12;
 [X]DE19753598  (MICRONAS INTERMETALL GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,7,9,10 * abstract * * column 4, line 29 - column 6, line 47 *;
 [A]DE4423935  (DEUTSCHE FORSCH LUFT RAUMFAHRT [DE]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * column 5, line 16 - column 5, line 65 *;
 [A]US3726597  (DVORAK J, et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * column 3, line 9 - column 4, line 18 *;
 [A]US3031924  (LAMAL JAMES C) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *