Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1162243

EP1162243 - UV curable composition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.06.2006
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SICPA HOLDING SA
Avenue de Florissant 41
1008 Prilly / CH
[N/P]
Former [2001/50]For all designated states
SICPA HOLDING S.A.
Avenue de Florissant 41
1008 Prilly / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Vuarnoz, Aline
Champ Devant
1747 Corserey / CH
02 / Veya, Patrick
Couvaloup 7
1110 Morges / CH
 [2001/50]
Representative(s)Hepp, Dieter , et al
Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG
Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
[N/P]
Former [2001/50]Hepp, Dieter , et al
Hepp, Wenger & Ryffel AG, Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
Application number, filing date00810493.707.06.2000
[2001/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1162243
Date:12.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1162243
Date:03.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:C09D11/10
[2001/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/50]
Extension statesLT18.02.2002
TitleGerman:Durch UV-Strahlung härtbare Zusammensetzung[2001/50]
English:UV curable composition[2001/50]
French:Composition réticulable par UV[2001/50]
Examination procedure18.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/17]
20.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
09.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.01.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.04.2005Fee for grant paid
25.04.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.05.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
01.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
02.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY03.08.2005
[2009/02]
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2745294  (ADHIPRESS [FR]) [X] 1-5,11-16 * page 2, line 16 - page 3, line 4 * * page 4, lines 3-13 *;
 [A]US5889084  (ROTH JOSEPH D [US]) [A] 1-5,11-16 * column 4, lines 16-27 * * column 8, lines 16-61 * * column 9, line 9 - column 10, line 49 * * column 11, lines 13-18 * * column 11, lines 58-65 *;
 [A]EP0668332  (REVLON CONSUMER PROD CORP [US]) [A] 1 * page 3, lines 29-40 * * page 3, line 41 - page 4, line 45 * * page 5, lines 1-8 *;
 [AD]EP0688838  (SICPA HOLDING SA [CH])
Examination   FALBE J.; REGITZ M., Römpp Chemie Lexikon, Band 6, pages 4936-4939, STUTTGART ** NEW YORK, GEORG THIEME VERLAG,
by applicantDE3614653
 EP0688838
 EP0233007
 US5215576
 EP0799871