Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1020261

EP1020261 - Device for portioning foodstuffs, in particular ground meat, to be packed in trays or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.01.2007
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.08.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 09.09.2009  [2009/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
REFIN S.r.l.
Contra della Misericordia, 14
36100 Vicenza / IT
[2006/09]
Former [2000/29]For all designated states
REFIN S.r.l.
Contra della Misericordia, 14
I-36100 Vicenza / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Righele, Giampietro
Via Tiziano, 5
36010 Zane', VI / IT
02 / Righele, Paolo
Via Tiziano, 5
36010 Zane', VI / IT
[2000/29]
Representative(s)Tonon, Gilberto , et al
Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A.
Piazza di Pietra, 38-39
00186 Roma / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/29]Tonon, Gilberto , et al
c/o Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Piazza di Pietra, 39
00186 Roma / IT
Application number, filing date00830011.314.01.2000
[2000/29]
Priority number, dateIT1999RM0003118.01.1999         Original published format: IT RM990031
[2000/29]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1020261
Date:19.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1020261
Date:21.05.2003
[2003/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1020261
Date:01.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:B26D7/30, B26D7/06, A22C7/00
[2003/20]
Former International [2000/29]B26D7/30
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/29]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Portionieren von auf Verpackungsschalen zu verpackenden Nahrungsmitteln, insbesondere von Hackfleisch[2003/20]
English:Device for portioning foodstuffs, in particular ground meat, to be packed in trays or the like[2000/29]
French:Dispositif pour le portionnement de produits alimentaires destinés à être conditionnés dans des barquettes, en particulier pour de la viande hachée[2000/29]
Former [2000/29]Vorrichtung zum portionieren von auf Verpackungsschalen zu verpackenden Nahrungsmitteln, insbesondere von Hackfleisch
Examination procedure20.11.2003Examination requested  [2004/04]
28.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.12.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
22.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.08.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.12.2005Fee for grant paid
01.12.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.12.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/06]
Request for further processing for:22.02.2005Request for further processing filed
22.02.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
10.03.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
03.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
28.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
02.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
28.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT01.03.2006
BE01.03.2006
CH01.03.2006
CY01.03.2006
FI01.03.2006
LI01.03.2006
NL01.03.2006
DK01.06.2006
SE01.06.2006
GR02.06.2006
PT01.08.2006
[2009/37]
Former [2008/19]AT01.03.2006
BE01.03.2006
CH01.03.2006
FI01.03.2006
LI01.03.2006
NL01.03.2006
DK01.06.2006
SE01.06.2006
GR02.06.2006
PT01.08.2006
Former [2008/04]AT01.03.2006
BE01.03.2006
CH01.03.2006
FI01.03.2006
LI01.03.2006
NL01.03.2006
DK01.06.2006
SE01.06.2006
PT01.08.2006
Former [2007/35]AT01.03.2006
BE01.03.2006
CH01.03.2006
FI01.03.2006
IT01.03.2006
LI01.03.2006
NL01.03.2006
DK01.06.2006
SE01.06.2006
PT01.08.2006
Former [2007/13]AT01.03.2006
BE01.03.2006
CH01.03.2006
FI01.03.2006
LI01.03.2006
NL01.03.2006
DK01.06.2006
SE01.06.2006
PT01.08.2006
Former [2007/09]AT01.03.2006
CH01.03.2006
FI01.03.2006
LI01.03.2006
NL01.03.2006
DK01.06.2006
SE01.06.2006
PT01.08.2006
Former [2007/08]AT01.03.2006
CH01.03.2006
FI01.03.2006
LI01.03.2006
NL01.03.2006
DK01.06.2006
SE01.06.2006
Former [2006/45]AT01.03.2006
CH01.03.2006
FI01.03.2006
LI01.03.2006
NL01.03.2006
SE01.06.2006
Former [2006/43]AT01.03.2006
CH01.03.2006
FI01.03.2006
LI01.03.2006
Former [2006/42]CH01.03.2006
FI01.03.2006
LI01.03.2006
Former [2006/36]FI01.03.2006
Documents cited:Search[YA]US5827561  (DUVE MANFRED [DE]) [Y] 1,2 * abstract * [A] 3,4;
 [YA]US3020687  (JOA CURT G) [Y] 1,2 * column 15, line 70 - line 75; figure 28 * [A] 3,4;
 [A]US4530132  (WAGNER RICHARD C [US]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5140800  (MARTIN STUART [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4193272  (BERNARD VINCENT E [US]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *