Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1039009

EP1039009 - Apparatus for the automatic orientation of tubular articles such as stockings and the like [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.07.2003
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.08.2003  [2003/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATEC S.p.A.
Via delle Nazioni Unite, 1
50018 Scandicci (Firenze) / IT
[2000/39]
Inventor(s)01 / Migliorini, Pier Lorenzo
Via Torino, 5
52028 Terranuova Bracciolini, Arezzo / IT
[2000/39]
Representative(s)Martini, Lazzaro
Studio Brevetti Ing. Dr. Lazzaro Martini s.r.l. Via dei Rustici 5
50122 Firenze / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]Martini, Lazzaro
Studio Brevetti Ing. Dr. Lazzaro Martini s.r.l. Via dei Rustici 5
50122 Firenze / IT
Application number, filing date00830182.213.03.2000
[2000/39]
Priority number, dateIT1999FI0005823.03.1999         Original published format: IT FI990058
[2000/39]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1039009
Date:27.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1039009
Date:21.03.2001
[2001/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1039009
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:D05B23/00
[2000/39]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/50]
Former [2000/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur automatischer Orientierung von schlauchförmigen Produkten wie Strümpfe oder dgl[2000/39]
English:Apparatus for the automatic orientation of tubular articles such as stockings and the like[2000/39]
French:Dispositif pour l'orientation automatique de produits tubulaires comme les bas ou analogues[2000/39]
Examination procedure18.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/39]
30.07.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
22.09.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
29.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.01.2002Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
05.02.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
20.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.06.2002Fee for grant paid
03.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
14.11.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DA]EP0818570  (MATEC SRL [IT]) [DA] 1,5 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 35 * * column 4, line 3 - line 12 * * column 7, line 19 - column 8, line 42 *;
 [A]EP0737769  (DETEXOMAT MACHINERY LTD [GB]) [A] 1,5 * column 6, line 14 - column 7, line 57 *