Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1046714

EP1046714 - A method and kit for measuring mitochondrial activity [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.11.2005
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.11.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.12.2005  [2005/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Universita' degli studi di Bologna
Via Zamboni, 33
40126 Bologna / IT
[2000/43]
Inventor(s)01 / Bovina, Carla
Via S. Stefano, 30
40125 Bologna / IT
02 / Lenaz, Giorgio
Strada Maggiore, 25
40125 Bologna / IT
03 / Tura, Sante
Via Cavallina, 8
40137 Bologna / IT
04 / Catani, Lucia
Corso Europa, 6
48018 Faenza (Ravenna) / IT
05 / Merlo Pich, Milena
Via L. Spada, 37
40129 Bologna / IT
[2000/43]
Representative(s)Tansini, Elio Fabrizio , et al
Bugnion S.p.A.
Via A. Gramsci, 42
50132 Firenze / IT
[N/P]
Former [2004/02]Tansini, Elio Fabrizio , et al
C/O Bugnion S.p.A., Viale Lancetti, 17
20158 Milano / IT
Former [2000/43]Lanzoni, Luciano
c/o BUGNION S.p.A. Via Goito, 18
40126 Bologna / IT
Application number, filing date00830232.528.03.2000
[2000/43]
Priority number, dateIT1999BO0018520.04.1999         Original published format: IT BO990185
[2000/43]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1046714
Date:25.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1046714
Date:24.01.2001
[2001/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP11.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/32
[2000/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/43]
TitleGerman:Ein Verfahren und ein Kit zur Bestimmung der Aktivität von Mitochondrien[2005/04]
English:A method and kit for measuring mitochondrial activity[2000/43]
French:Une méthode et trousse pour mesurer l'activité mitochondriale[2000/43]
Former [2000/43]Ein Verfahren und Satz zur Bestimmung von mitochondrialer Wirksamkeit
Examination procedure15.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/36]
02.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.01.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.06.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/51]
18.07.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2005/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
24.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200506   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5198336  (KNOBELOCH LYNDA M [US], et al) [A] 1,15,17 * page 9, column 10; claims 8,11,12 *;
 [XY]  LENAZ G ET AL, "MITOCHONDRIA, OXIDATIVE STRESS, AND ANTIOXIDANT DEFENCES", ACTA BIOCHIMICA POLONICA,WARSZAWA,PO, (19990330), vol. 46, no. 1, pages 1 - 21, XP000955669 [X] 1-3,7-17 * abstract * * page 9, column L, line 1 - page 10, column L, line 22; table 5 * * page 11, column L, line 4 - line 9; table 6 * [Y] 1,4-6,15,18,19
 [X]  HOLMSEN H, Biochemistry of the platelet: Energy metabolism, PHILADELPHIA, LIPPINCOTT, XP002151806 [X] 1-3,7-17 * page 631 - page 643; table 1 *
 [Y]  MAKLER MT AND HINRICHS DJ, "measurement of the lactate dehydrogenase activity of plasmodium falciparum as an assessment of parasitemia", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF TROPICAL MEDICINE AND HYGIENE, (1993), vol. 48, no. 2, pages 205 - 210, XP000957646 [Y] 1,4-6,15,18 * abstract *
 [Y]  SAJKO W ET AL, "ADMINISTRATION OF LACTATE DEHYDROGENASE FROM THE OX HEART TO DETERMINE THE CONTENT OF PYRUVATE IN MILK", MEDYCYNA WETERYNARYJNA, (1985), vol. 41, no. 7, ISSN 0025-8628, pages 442 - 444, XP000961629 [Y] 1,4,5,15,19 * abstract * * page 444, column R, line 12 - line 21 *
 [A]  HOMYK M ET AL, "STEADY-STATE KINETICS AND THE INACTIVATION BY 2 3 BUTANEDIONE OF THE ENERGY INDEPENDENT TRANSHYDROGENASE OF ESCHERICHIA-COLI CELL MEMBRANES", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (1979), vol. 571, no. 2, ISSN 0006-3002, pages 201 - 217, XP000961571 [A] 1,15,18,20 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0005-2744(79)90091-3
 [A]  HOLMSEN H ET AL, "HYDROGEN PER OXIDE LOWERS ATP LEVELS IN PLATELETS WITHOUT ALTERING ADENYLATE ENERGY CHARGE AND PLATELET FUNCTION", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1977), vol. 252, no. 5, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 1752 - 1757, XP000957788 [A] 1,7,10 * page 1752, column R, line 12 - line 21 * * page 1752, column R, line 50 - line 53 *
 [A]  HOLMSEN H ET AL, "EFFECTS OF ANTIMYCIN A AND 2 DEOXY GLUCOSE ON SECRETION IN HUMAN PLATELETS DIFFERENTIAL INHIBITION OF THE SECRETION OF ACID HYDROLASES AND ADENINE NUCLEOTIDES", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, (1979), vol. 182, no. 2, ISSN 0264-6021, pages 413 - 420, XP000957789 [A] 1-3,7-17 * abstract * * page 414, line 6 - line 36 *