Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1159908

EP1159908 - A tool for food flouring [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.03.2003
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.05.2003  [2003/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bellucci, Emanuele
Via della Casa Comunale, 2
60100 Ancona / IT
For all designated states
Alunni Bistocchi, Emanuela
Via Verga, 241
62100 Macerata / IT
[2001/49]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2001/49]
Representative(s)Baldi, Claudio
Piazza Ghislieri, 3
60035 Jesi (Ancona) / IT
[2001/49]
Application number, filing date00830499.017.07.2000
[2001/49]
Priority number, dateIT2000AN0001518.05.2000         Original published format: IT AN200015
[2001/49]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1159908
Date:05.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1159908
Date:19.12.2001
[2001/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:A47J43/22, A21C9/04, A23P1/08, A23G3/20
[2001/51]
Former International [2001/49]A47J43/22
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2002/37]
Former [2001/49]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Ein Gerät zum Streuen von Mehl auf Nahrungsmittel[2001/49]
English:A tool for food flouring[2001/49]
French:Un outil pour poudrer de la nourriture[2001/49]
Examination procedure20.06.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/19]
22.11.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2003/19]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
26.07.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
26.07.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
26.07.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
26.07.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
26.07.2002DE   M01   Not yet paid
26.07.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
26.07.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
26.07.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
26.07.2002FR   M01   Not yet paid
26.07.2002GB   M01   Not yet paid
26.07.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
26.07.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
26.07.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
26.07.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
26.07.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
26.07.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
26.07.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
26.07.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
26.07.2002M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200203   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5133278  (ANDERES RAYMOND M [US]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [X]US1842101  (KAUFMANN JAMES J) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2616391  (RUSSELL HERMAN F) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5134956  (STEWART BILLY J [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US1718418  (HATCH C. T.) [A] 1 * the whole document *