Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1090576

EP1090576 - Analogue temperature indicator for cooking receptacles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.08.2003
Database last updated on 17.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.10.2003  [2003/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Guatta Andrea S.p.A.
Via S. Pietro 62
25077 Roe' Volciano-Brescia / IT
[2001/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Guatta, Andrea
62, Via S.Pietro
25077 Roe' Volciano (Brescia) / IT
 [2001/15]
Representative(s)Manzoni, Alessandro
MANZONI & MANZONI, UFFICIO INTERNAZIONALE BREVETTI, P.le Arnaldo 2
25121 Brescia / IT
[2001/15]
Application number, filing date00830545.031.07.2000
[2001/15]
Priority number, dateIT1999BS00091U05.10.1999         Original published format: IT BS990091 U
[2001/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1090576
Date:11.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1090576
Date:20.03.2002
[2002/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.01.2002
ClassificationInternational:A47J45/06
[2001/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/15]
Extension statesAL10.05.2002
LT10.05.2002
LV10.05.2002
MK10.05.2002
RO10.05.2002
SI10.05.2002
TitleGerman:Analoger Temperaturindikator für Kochgefässe[2001/15]
English:Analogue temperature indicator for cooking receptacles[2001/15]
French:Indicateur de température analogue pour récipients de cuisson[2001/15]
Examination procedure10.05.2002Examination requested  [2002/33]
26.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.04.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/41]
09.05.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2003/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200203   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]GB1004404  (CORFIELD SIGG LTD, et al) [A] 1-4 * column 3, line 3 - column 3, line 52; claim 1 *;
 [A]US4134299  (RUEGER ROLF) [A] 1-4 * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 27; claim 1 *;
 [A]FR2535190  (GIORINOX SPA [IT]) [A] 1-4 * page 2, line 18 - page 3, line 27 *;
 [A]DE19602826  (AMC INT ALFA METALCRAFT CORP [CH]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 63 - column 1, line 68 *;
 [A]US3851529  (ANDREWS R, et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 21 - column 4, line 20; claim 1 *