Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1162301

EP1162301 - Process and system for eliminating catalytically burned oxygen inside dry cleaning machines [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.11.2005
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.11.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.01.2006  [2006/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L i n d u s S.r.l.
Via Armaroli. 16/AB
40012 Calderara di Reno (Bologna) / IT
[2001/50]
Inventor(s)01 / Nardini, Gian Vieri
Via Romagna, 47
47838 Riccione (Forli) / IT
 [2001/50]
Representative(s)Trentini, Ermanno
Viale A. Aldini, 118
40136 Bologna / IT
[N/P]
Former [2001/50]Trentini, Ermanno, Ing.
Viale A. Aldini, 118
40136 Bologna / IT
Application number, filing date00830853.828.12.2000
[2001/50]
Priority number, dateIT2000BO0034409.06.2000         Original published format: IT BO000344
[2001/50]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1162301
Date:12.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:D06F43/00
[2001/50]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB [2002/38]
Former [2002/36]DE,  ES 
Former [2001/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesSI22.01.2001
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System zur Entfernung von katalytischen verbranntem Sauerstoff in einer Trockenreinigungsmaschine[2001/50]
English:Process and system for eliminating catalytically burned oxygen inside dry cleaning machines[2001/50]
French:Procédé et system de l'élimination d'oxygène qui sont brulées catalytiquement à l'intérieur des machines de nettoyage à sec[2001/50]
Examination procedure30.05.2002Examination requested  [2002/31]
03.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.07.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/02]
10.08.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
18.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200405   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US6049993  (BARIS ERTAN [US]) [A] 1,5 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9310301  (SAAL WAESCHEREIMASCHINENTECHNI [DE]) [A] 1,5 * page 10, line 18 - page 11, line 10 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]EP0547472  (ENDRESS & HAUSER GASTEC GMBH & [DE]) [A] 1 * claims 1,2 *