Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1037126

EP1037126 - A signal handling device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.09.2009
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 02.11.2011  [2011/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LEINE & LINDE AB
Box 8
645 21 Strängnäs / SE
For all designated states
Dr. Johannes Heidenhain GmbH
Postfach 12 60
83292 Traunreut / DE
[2008/47]
Former [2000/38]For all designated states
LEINE & LINDE AB
Box 8
645 21 Strängnäs / SE
For all designated states
Dr. Johannes Heidenhain GmbH
Postfach 12 60
83292 Traunreut / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Fuchs, Peter
Chiemgaustrasse 17A
83349 Palling / DE
02 / Thorsander, Ulf
Sleipnersväg 39
155 34 Nykvarn / SE
[2000/38]
Representative(s)Stein, Jan , et al
Zacco Sweden AB
Valhallavägen 117
Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/38]Stein, Jan Anders Lennart , et al
Albihns Patentbyra Stockholm AB, Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date00850041.507.03.2000
[2000/38]
Priority number, dateSE1999000082008.03.1999         Original published format: SE 9900820
US1999036444830.07.1999         Original published format: US 364448
[2000/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1037126
Date:20.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1037126
Date:05.07.2006
[2006/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1037126
Date:19.11.2008
Language:EN
[2008/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.06.2006
ClassificationInternational:G05B19/042, G05B19/414
[2006/27]
Former International [2000/38]G05B19/042
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/38]
TitleGerman:Signalverarbeitungseinrichtung[2000/38]
English:A signal handling device[2000/38]
French:Dispositif de traitement de signaux[2000/38]
Examination procedure05.10.2006Examination requested  [2006/46]
06.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.10.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.07.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.10.2008Fee for grant paid
07.10.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.08.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
20.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
08.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
15.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
14.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
13.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.11.2008
BE19.11.2008
CY19.11.2008
DK19.11.2008
FI19.11.2008
NL19.11.2008
GR20.02.2009
ES01.03.2009
IE07.03.2009
LU07.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
PT20.04.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/21]AT19.11.2008
BE19.11.2008
DK19.11.2008
FI19.11.2008
NL19.11.2008
GR20.02.2009
ES01.03.2009
IE07.03.2009
LU07.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
PT20.04.2009
Former [2010/47]AT19.11.2008
BE19.11.2008
DK19.11.2008
FI19.11.2008
NL19.11.2008
GR20.02.2009
ES01.03.2009
IE07.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
PT20.04.2009
Former [2010/07]AT19.11.2008
BE19.11.2008
DK19.11.2008
FI19.11.2008
NL19.11.2008
ES01.03.2009
IE07.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
PT20.04.2009
Former [2009/47]AT19.11.2008
BE19.11.2008
DK19.11.2008
FI19.11.2008
NL19.11.2008
ES01.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
PT20.04.2009
Former [2009/37]AT19.11.2008
BE19.11.2008
DK19.11.2008
FI19.11.2008
NL19.11.2008
ES01.03.2009
PT20.04.2009
Former [2009/34]AT19.11.2008
BE19.11.2008
DK19.11.2008
FI19.11.2008
NL19.11.2008
ES01.03.2009
Former [2009/32]AT19.11.2008
BE19.11.2008
FI19.11.2008
NL19.11.2008
ES01.03.2009
Former [2009/25]AT19.11.2008
FI19.11.2008
NL19.11.2008
ES01.03.2009
Former [2009/23]AT19.11.2008
ES01.03.2009
Former [2009/20]ES01.03.2009
Documents cited:Search[A]US5420485  (CAMPBELL JR ROBERT L [US]) [A] 1-19 * column W *;
 [A]US4878002  (HEATZIG ERIC [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * column W *;
 [DA]US5687103  (HAGL RAINER [DE], et al) [DA] 1-19 * column W *;
 [A]DE19633744  (BAUMUELLER ANLAGEN SYSTEMTECH [DE]) [A] 1-19 * column W *
 [A]  ODEBERG H, "A tactile sensor data-processing system", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, CH, (199507), vol. 49, no. 3, ISSN 0924-4247, pages 173 - 180, XP004303640 [A] 1-19 * column W *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0924-4247(95)01030-5