Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1067116

EP1067116 - Process for the production of imines [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  18.07.2008
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2008Refusal of applicationpublished on 20.08.2008  [2008/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/02]For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Smets, Johan
Bollenberg 79
3210 Lubbeek / BE
02 / Wevers, Jean
Heide 17
1840 Steenhuffel / BE
 [2001/02]
Representative(s)Mather, Peter Geoffrey , et al
NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA
100 Temselaan
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
[N/P]
Former [2002/23]Mather, Peter Geoffrey , et al
NV Procter & Gamble Services SA, 100 Temselaan
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Former [2001/02]Gault, Nathalie , et al
BVBA Procter & Gamble Europe Sprl Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Application number, filing date00870067.612.04.2000
[2001/02]
Priority number, dateEP1999040173609.07.1999         Original published format: EP 99401736
[2001/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1067116
Date:10.01.2001
Language:EN
[2001/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP25.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:C07C249/02, C11D3/50
[2001/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/02]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Iminen[2001/02]
English:Process for the production of imines[2001/02]
French:Procédé de préparation d'imines[2001/02]
Examination procedure11.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/32]
30.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.06.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
23.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.11.2003Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/34]
29.05.2008Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/34]
Appeal following examination12.01.2004Appeal received No.  T0456/04
16.03.2004Statement of grounds filed
19.05.2008Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn
03.07.2008Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:14.08.2003Request for further processing filed
14.08.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.10.2003Decision despatched
24.09.2002Request for further processing filed
24.09.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
10.10.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
07.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
06.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
04.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
10.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
18.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]US3625710  (RIZZI GEORGE P) [X] 1-20 * column W *;
 [XA]EP0392619  (QUEST INT [NL]) [X] 10-20 * the whole document * [A] 1-9;
 [XA]USH1468H  (COSTA JILL B [US], et al) [X] 10-20 * column 4, line 38 - line 41 * [A] 1-9;
 [XA]  KAMOGAWA H ET AL, "Chemical release control- Schiff bases of perfume aldehydes and aminostyrenes", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE, POLYMER CHEMISTRY EDITION,US,JOHN WILEY AND SONS. NEW YORK, vol. 20, ISSN 0887-624X, page 3121-3129, XP002084908 [X] 10-20 * the whole document * [A] 1-9

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pol.1982.170201108
 [X]  TEXIER-BOULLER, F., "A Simple, Convenient and Mild Synthesis of Imines on Alumina Surface without Solvent", SYNTHESIS, (198506), pages 679 - 680, XP002126039 [X] 1,2,5,7,9 * table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-1985-31308
 [X]  ENDERS, D. ET AL., "Asymmetric Synthesis of alpha'-Silylated alpha-Iodo Ketones via Iodination with Trifluoroiodomethane", SYNLETT, (199711), pages 1271 - 1272, XP002126040 [X] 1,2 * step a) *