EP1031686 - Lock with handle actuated and lockable main latch bolt [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kaba GmbH Wiener Strasse 41-43 3130 Herzogenburg / AT | [2003/27] |
Former [2000/35] | For all designated states Kaba Gege GmbH Wiener Strasse 41-43 3130 Herzogenburg / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Helmreich, Josef St. Pöltnerstrasse 36 3130 Herzogenburg / AT | 02 /
Luef, Heinz Weingasse 10 3133 Traismaier / AT | [2000/35] | Representative(s) | Müllner, Martin, et al Patentanwälte Martin Müllner, Markus Speringer Postfach 169 Weihburggasse 9 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/12] | Müllner, Martin, et al Patentanwalt Weihburggasse 9, Postfach 159 1014 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2000/35] | Müllner, Erwin, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Erwin Müllner Dipl.-Ing. Werner Katschinka Postfach 159 Weihburggasse 9 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 00890036.7 | 11.02.2000 | [2000/35] | Priority number, date | AT19990000317 | 24.02.1999 Original published format: AT 31799 | [2000/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1031686 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1031686 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | [2001/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1031686 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E05B55/12, E05B63/20, E05B59/00 | [2000/35] | CPC: |
E05B63/20 (EP);
E05B55/12 (EP);
E05B2063/207 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/35] | Title | German: | Schloss mit drückerbetätigbarer und verriegelbarer Hauptfalle | [2000/35] | English: | Lock with handle actuated and lockable main latch bolt | [2000/35] | French: | Serrure avec un pêne demi-tour principal verrouillable actionné par une poignée | [2000/35] | Examination procedure | 10.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/06] | 20.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.10.2006 | FI | 11.10.2006 | IE | 11.10.2006 | NL | 11.10.2006 | DK | 11.01.2007 | SE | 11.01.2007 | GR | 12.01.2007 | LU | 11.02.2007 | BE | 28.02.2007 | MC | 28.02.2007 | PT | 19.03.2007 | [2009/37] |
Former [2008/19] | FI | 11.10.2006 | |
IE | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
GR | 12.01.2007 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | FI | 11.10.2006 | |
IE | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | FI | 11.10.2006 | |
IE | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/42] | FI | 11.10.2006 | |
IE | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | FI | 11.10.2006 | |
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | FI | 11.10.2006 | |
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 11.10.2006 | |
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/19] | NL | 11.10.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0670404 (FUSS FRITZ GMBH & CO [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0854261 (FUSS FRITZ GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1* column 6, line 15 - line 27; claim 1 * | by applicant | DE215150 | DE3700891 | EP0670404 |