EP1165390 - IMPROVED CONTAINER CLOSURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROYAL PACKAGING INDUSTRIES VAN LEER N.V. P.O. Box 25 1180 AA Amstelveen / NL | [2002/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAKKER, Renee Gouldpluvier 71 NL-1121 HW Handsmeer / NL | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Weston, Robert Dale, et al PHILLIPS & LEIGH 5 Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | Weston, Robert Dale, et al PHILLIPS & LEIGH 5 Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00900749.3 | 24.01.2000 | [2002/01] | WO2000GB00184 | Priority number, date | EP19990300769 | 02.02.1999 Original published format: EP 99300769 | [2002/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0046115 | Date: | 10.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1165390 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1165390 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65D39/08 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
B65D39/084 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/01] | Title | German: | BEHÄLTERVERSCHLUSS | [2002/01] | English: | IMPROVED CONTAINER CLOSURES | [2002/01] | French: | FERMETURES AMELIOREES POUR CONTENEURS | [2002/01] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.07.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 24.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.07.2003 | BE | 23.07.2003 | CH | 23.07.2003 | CY | 23.07.2003 | FI | 23.07.2003 | LI | 23.07.2003 | NL | 23.07.2003 | DK | 23.10.2003 | GR | 23.10.2003 | SE | 23.10.2003 | ES | 03.11.2003 | PT | 23.12.2003 | GB | 24.01.2004 | LU | 24.01.2004 | IE | 26.01.2004 | FR | 31.01.2004 | MC | 31.01.2004 | [2008/43] |
Former [2007/08] | AT | 23.07.2003 | |
BE | 23.07.2003 | ||
CH | 23.07.2003 | ||
CY | 23.07.2003 | ||
FI | 23.07.2003 | ||
LI | 23.07.2003 | ||
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
DK | 23.10.2003 | ||
GR | 23.10.2003 | ||
SE | 23.10.2003 | ||
ES | 03.11.2003 | ||
PT | 23.12.2003 | ||
GB | 24.01.2004 | ||
LU | 24.01.2004 | ||
IE | 26.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 23.07.2003 | |
BE | 23.07.2003 | ||
CH | 23.07.2003 | ||
FI | 23.07.2003 | ||
LI | 23.07.2003 | ||
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
DK | 23.10.2003 | ||
GR | 23.10.2003 | ||
SE | 23.10.2003 | ||
ES | 03.11.2003 | ||
PT | 23.12.2003 | ||
GB | 24.01.2004 | ||
LU | 24.01.2004 | ||
IE | 26.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | AT | 23.07.2003 | |
BE | 23.07.2003 | ||
CH | 23.07.2003 | ||
FI | 23.07.2003 | ||
LI | 23.07.2003 | ||
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
DK | 23.10.2003 | ||
GR | 23.10.2003 | ||
SE | 23.10.2003 | ||
ES | 03.11.2003 | ||
PT | 23.12.2003 | ||
GB | 24.01.2004 | ||
IE | 26.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 23.07.2003 | |
BE | 23.07.2003 | ||
CH | 23.07.2003 | ||
FI | 23.07.2003 | ||
LI | 23.07.2003 | ||
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
DK | 23.10.2003 | ||
GR | 23.10.2003 | ||
SE | 23.10.2003 | ||
ES | 03.11.2003 | ||
PT | 23.12.2003 | ||
GB | 24.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 23.07.2003 | |
BE | 23.07.2003 | ||
CH | 23.07.2003 | ||
FI | 23.07.2003 | ||
LI | 23.07.2003 | ||
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
DK | 23.10.2003 | ||
GR | 23.10.2003 | ||
SE | 23.10.2003 | ||
ES | 03.11.2003 | ||
PT | 23.12.2003 | ||
GB | 24.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 23.07.2003 | |
BE | 23.07.2003 | ||
CH | 23.07.2003 | ||
FI | 23.07.2003 | ||
LI | 23.07.2003 | ||
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
DK | 23.10.2003 | ||
GR | 23.10.2003 | ||
SE | 23.10.2003 | ||
ES | 03.11.2003 | ||
PT | 23.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 23.07.2003 | |
BE | 23.07.2003 | ||
CH | 23.07.2003 | ||
FI | 23.07.2003 | ||
LI | 23.07.2003 | ||
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
DK | 23.10.2003 | ||
GR | 23.10.2003 | ||
SE | 23.10.2003 | ||
PT | 23.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 23.07.2003 | |
BE | 23.07.2003 | ||
CH | 23.07.2003 | ||
FI | 23.07.2003 | ||
LI | 23.07.2003 | ||
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
DK | 23.10.2003 | ||
GR | 23.10.2003 | ||
SE | 23.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 23.07.2003 | |
BE | 23.07.2003 | ||
CH | 23.07.2003 | ||
FI | 23.07.2003 | ||
LI | 23.07.2003 | ||
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.10.2003 | ||
SE | 23.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 23.07.2003 | |
CH | 23.07.2003 | ||
FI | 23.07.2003 | ||
LI | 23.07.2003 | ||
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.10.2003 | ||
SE | 23.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | AT | 23.07.2003 | |
FI | 23.07.2003 | ||
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.10.2003 | ||
SE | 23.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 23.07.2003 | |
FI | 23.07.2003 | ||
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | FI | 23.07.2003 | |
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 23.07.2003 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3208775 (MAXIMILIAN STAP, et al) [Y] 2-4,7-13 * column 3, line 30 - line 46; figure 3 *; | [A]GB1392603 (DRUMS LTD) [A] 1 * page 2, column L, line 2 - column R, line 79; figure 3 *; | [A]US3946894 (SIMKUS VYTO) [A] 1-13 * column 2, line 24 - column 4, line 13; figure - *; | [A]FR2520467 (COMIND SPA AZIENDA AGES [IT]) [A] 1* claim 1 *; | [XY]EP0614434 (LEER KONINKLIJKE EMBALLAGE [NL]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 18 - line 23; claim 1 * [Y] 2-4,7-13; | [A]FR2755723 (PHOENIX FRANCE [FR]) [A] 4,5 * page 3, line 33 - page 4, line 9 * |