Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1158941

EP1158941 - IMPROVED COOLING/HEATING PAD AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.08.2006
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.08.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.09.2006  [2006/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medivance, Inc.
Suite 100, 500 South Arthur Avenue
Louisville, CO 80027 / US
[2001/49]
Inventor(s)01 / CARSON, Gary, Allen
21 McIntyre Court
Golden, CO 80401 / US
 [2001/49]
Representative(s)Mallalieu, Catherine Louise , et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/49]Mallalieu, Catherine Louise , et al
D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date00901378.003.01.2000
[2001/49]
WO2000US00026
Priority number, dateUS1999022507004.01.1999         Original published format: US 225070
US2000047685003.01.2000         Original published format: US 476850
[2001/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0040185
Date:13.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1158941
Date:05.12.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2000
[2001/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1158941
Date:12.10.2005
Language:EN
[2005/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US13.07.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.04.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61F7/00
[2005/40]
Former International [2002/23]A61F7/00, A61F7/04
Former International [2001/49]A61F7/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/20]
Former [2001/49]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTES KÜHL-/HEIZKISSEN UND -SYSTEM[2001/49]
English:IMPROVED COOLING/HEATING PAD AND SYSTEM[2001/49]
French:COUSSIN DE REFROIDISSEMENT ET DE CHAUFFAGE PERFECTIONNE ET SYSTEME Y RELATIF[2001/49]
Entry into regional phase03.08.2001National basic fee paid 
03.08.2001Search fee paid 
03.08.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
03.08.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.08.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
03.08.2001Examination requested  [2001/49]
06.08.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.02.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.07.2005Fee for grant paid
25.07.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP05077293.8  / EP1616543
Opposition(s)13.07.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
14.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
12.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5431622  (PYROZYK RONALD R [CA], et al) [Y] 1-9,18-28 * column 1, line 42 - line 68 * * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 3 * * column 5, line 29 - line 36 * * figure 4 *;
 [Y]DE19627245  (USUI AKIO [JP]) [Y] 1,3,4 * column 39, line 8 - line 29 * * figure 1 *;
 [Y]US5645855  (LORENZ DONALD H [US]) [Y] 2,21 * column 1, line 5 - line 15 * * column 3, line 39 - line 41 * * column 7, line 63 *;
 [Y]US5456701  (STOUT EDWARD I [US]) [Y] 5-8,18-20 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 22 *;
 [Y]US5755755  (PANYARD ALBERT A [US]) [Y] 9 * column 5, line 46 - line 57 *;
 [Y]US5662695  (MASON BRADLEY R [US], et al) [Y] 22-28 * column 6, line 55 - line 58 * * figure 3 *;
 [A]US3871376  (KOZAK THEODORE F);
 [A]US5306504  (LORENZ DONALD H [US])
International search[X]US4962761  (GOLDEN THEODORE A [US]);
 [YP]US5913849  (SUNDSTROEM STAFFAN [SE], et al);
 [AP]US5879378  (USUI AKIO [JP]);
 [AP]US5887437  (MAXIM ROSEMARY S [US])