Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1142213

EP1142213 - DYNAMIC ASSIGNMENT OF TRAFFIC CLASSES TO A PRIORITY QUEUE IN A PACKET FORWARDING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.09.2006
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 20.08.2008  [2008/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nortel Networks Limited
2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St.Laurent
Québec H4S 2A9 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2005/47]For all designated states
Nortel Networks Limited
2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St.Laurent
Québec H4S 2A9 / CA
Former [2003/38]For all designated states
Nortel Networks Limited
2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel
St.Laurent, Québec H4S 2A9 / CA
Former [2001/41]For all designated states
Nortel Networks Limited
World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th floor
Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / LAVIAN, Tal, I.
1351 Zurich Terrace
Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US
02 / LAU, Stephen
982 Sando Ridge Court
Milpitas, CA 95035 / US
 [2001/41]
Representative(s)Mackenzie, Andrew Bryan , et al
Scott & York
Intellectual Property Limited
45 Grosvenor Road
St. Albans Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]Mackenzie, Andrew Bryan , et al
Scott & York Intelleczual Property Limited 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans
Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB
Former [2004/15]Mackenzie, Andrew Bryan , et al
Sommerville & Rushton, 45 Grosvenor Road
St Albans, Herts. AL1 3AW / GB
Former [2004/03]Free, Rachel, Dr. , et al
Nortel Networks Intellectual Property Law Group London Road
Harlow Essex CM17 9NA / GB
Former [2003/15]Stainthorpe, Vanessa J.
Harrison Goddard Foote, Fountain Precinct, Leopold Street
Sheffield S1 2QD / GB
Former [2001/41]Jones, Keith William , et al
Harrison Goddard Foote Orlando House 11c Compstall Road Marple Bridge
Stockport SK6 5HH / GB
Application number, filing date00901402.807.01.2000
[2001/41]
WO2000US00428
Priority number, dateUS1999022738908.01.1999         Original published format: US 227389
[2001/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0041368
Date:13.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/28]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1142213
Date:10.10.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2000
[2001/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1142213
Date:23.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/56, H04L29/06
[2001/41]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/20]
Former [2001/41]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:DYNAMISCHE ZUWEISUNG VERKEHRSKLASSEN AN EINER PRIORITÄTSWARTESCHLANGE IN EINER PAKETBEFÖRDERUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2001/41]
English:DYNAMIC ASSIGNMENT OF TRAFFIC CLASSES TO A PRIORITY QUEUE IN A PACKET FORWARDING DEVICE[2001/41]
French:AFFECTATION DYNAMIQUE DE CLASSES DE TRAFIC A UNE FILE D'ATTENTE PRIORITAIRE DANS UN DISPOSITIF DE REACHEMINEMENT DE PAQUETS[2001/41]
Entry into regional phase08.08.2001National basic fee paid 
08.08.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
08.08.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.07.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.07.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.08.2001Examination requested  [2001/41]
02.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.04.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.08.2005Fee for grant paid
22.08.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
05.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
07.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XAY]WO9900949  (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC) [X] 1,5-10,14-20 * page 7, line 15 - page 8, line 29 * * page 10, line 19 - line 24 * * page 19, line 29 - page 21, line 25 * * page 25, line 11 - line 26 * * page 28, line 25 - page 31, line 30 * * page 34, line 1 - page 35, line 28 * * page 36, line 11 - page 37, line 17 * * claim 1 * [A] 23 [Y] 2-4,11-13,21,22;
 [X]EP0872979  (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC) [X] 23 * page 6, column 9, line 7 - line 30 * * page 8, column 13, line 34 - column 14, line 6 * * page 9, column 15, line 9 - line 23 *
 [Y]  - TENNENHOUSE D L ET AL, "A SURVEY OF ACTIVE NETWORK RESEARCH", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE,US,IEEE SERVICE CENTER. PISCATAWAY, N.J, (19970101), vol. 35, no. 1, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 80 - 86, XP000683447 [Y] 2-4,11-13,21,22 * page 80, column R, line 7 - line 21 * * page 81, column R, line 13 - page 82, column L, line 11 * * page 82, column R, line 27 - page 83, column L, line 10 * * page 83, column R, line 6 - page 84, column R, line 23 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/35.568214