blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1142213 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1142213



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 367
27.09.2006 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
08.02.2006 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
13.10.2005 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
22.08.2005 Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 2
19.08.2005 Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
19.08.2005 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
19.08.2005 French translation of claims Search / examination 6
19.08.2005 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
20.04.2005 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
20.04.2005 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
20.04.2005 Text intended for grant Search / examination 34
22.12.2004 Claims Search / examination 5
22.12.2004 Description Search / examination 1
22.12.2004 Drawings Search / examination 8
22.12.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.12.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 17
08.10.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
02.10.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.09.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
02.06.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
02.06.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.04.2004 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
18.02.2004 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
20.01.2004 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
20.01.2004 Request for change of representative Search / examination 2
27.11.2003 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
21.11.2003 General authorisation Search / examination 1
19.11.2003 General authorisation Search / examination 1
19.11.2003 General authorisation Search / examination 1
25.08.2003 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.08.2003 General enquiry Search / examination 1
04.08.2003 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
15.07.2003 Request for change of address Search / examination 3
24.02.2003 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
13.02.2003 Document concerning representation Search / examination 3
04.10.2001 Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 43
30.08.2001 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
29.08.2001 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
26.07.2001 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
26.07.2001 Claims Search / examination 7
26.07.2001 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
07.06.2001 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 8
07.05.2001 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
07.05.2001 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
07.05.2001 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
07.05.2001 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
07.05.2001 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
07.05.2001 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
07.05.2001 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
07.05.2001 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
07.02.2001 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
07.02.2001 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
07.02.2001 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
28.12.2000 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 5
28.12.2000 Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 2
15.11.2000 Non-unity - restrict claims/pay fees PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
09.11.2000 Notification of the recording of a change PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.11.2000 Notification of the recording of a change PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.11.2000 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
08.11.2000 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
12.09.2000 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 2
16.08.2000 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
09.08.2000 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.08.2000 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
05.08.2000 Request for change of name Search / examination 7
31.07.2000 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
31.07.2000 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
27.07.2000 Priority document Search / examination 42
20.07.2000 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
13.07.2000 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 36
11.02.2000 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
11.02.2000 Claims International Searching Authority 7
11.02.2000 Description International Searching Authority 21
11.02.2000 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
11.02.2000 Drawings International Searching Authority 6