blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1142213


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
18.07.2008 Change - representative published on  20.08.2008  [2008/34]
29.09.2006 No opposition filed within time limit published on  02.11.2006  [2006/44]
07.10.2005 (Expected) grant published on  23.11.2005  [2005/47]
01.09.2005 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
01.09.2005 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
15.04.2005 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
21.01.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.12.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
05.10.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
28.05.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
28.05.2004 First examination report
26.03.2004 Change - designated states published on  12.05.2004  [2004/20]
20.02.2004 Change - representative published on  07.04.2004  [2004/15]
22.01.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.11.2003 Change - representative published on  14.01.2004  [2004/03]
02.08.2003 Change - applicant published on  17.09.2003  [2003/38]
21.02.2003 Change - representative published on  09.04.2003  [2003/15]
13.02.2003 Renewal fee
03.04.2002 Change - extension states
25.02.2002 Renewal fee
24.08.2001 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.10.2001 [2001/41]
24.08.2001 Request for examination filed published on  10.10.2001 [2001/41]
20.08.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
16.08.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
16.08.2001 Amendment by applicant
15.01.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
29.09.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
05.09.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
09.08.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
18.07.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
17.07.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
24.05.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
23.02.2000 PCT data prior to European publication