Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1142213
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7710871Global Dossier 04.05.2010B2
US2004076161 22.04.2004A1
Priority number Date
US22738999 08.01.1999
US68594703 15.10.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1142213Global Dossier 23.11.2005B1
EP1142213 10.10.2001A2
Priority number Date
US22738999 08.01.1999
US0000428 07.01.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2224900 24.07.2000A
Priority number Date
US22738999 08.01.1999
US0000428 07.01.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2358525 01.04.2008C
CA2358525 13.07.2000A1
Priority number Date
US22738999 08.01.1999
US0000428 07.01.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE60024228T 10.08.2006T2
DE60024228D 29.12.2005D1
Priority number Date
US22738999 08.01.1999
US0000428 07.01.2000
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO0041368Global Dossier 04.10.2001A9
WO0041368 28.12.2000A3
WO0041368 13.07.2000A2
Priority number Date
US22738999 08.01.1999