blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1142213

Designated contracting states DE 
 FR 
 GB 
Examination procedure22.08.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase08.08.2001National basic fee paid 
08.08.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
08.08.2001Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
05.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
07.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
European patent granted23.11.2005
Opposition procedure24.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit published on 01.11.2006 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:10.10.2001 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:10.10.2001 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:10.10.2001 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20010808
 
Event date:17.09.2003 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:NORTEL NETWORKS LIMITED
 
Event date:12.05.2004 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTED)
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:14.07.2004 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20040602
 
Event date:23.11.2005 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:23.11.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:29.12.2005 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:60024228
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20051229
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:09.06.2006 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:02.11.2006 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20060824
 
Event date:30.06.2010 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20100129
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:15.12.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R119 60024228 DE
Code Expl.:-APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20110802
 
Event date:30.04.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20130102
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:30.04.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20130204
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:28.06.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20110802
 
Event date:24.09.2014 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20140107
 
Event date:31.10.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20140930
 
Event date:28.11.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20140131
 
Event date:28.11.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20140107