Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1072051

EP1072051 - CATHODE RAY TUBE WITH GETTER ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.05.2005
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.05.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.07.2005  [2005/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2001/05]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / HAGELUKEN, Ben, H.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
02 / DE OLIVEIRA, Joao, C.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
 [2001/05]
Representative(s)van der Veer, Johannis Leendert
Philips
Intellectual Property & Standards
P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2001/05]van der Veer, Johannis Leendert
International Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date00901552.013.01.2000
[2001/05]
WO2000EP00230
Priority number, dateEP1999020040512.02.1999         Original published format: EP 99200405
[2001/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0048217
Date:17.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1072051
Date:31.01.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2000
[2001/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1072051
Date:21.07.2004
Language:EN
[2004/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01J7/18, H01J29/94
[2001/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/30]
Former [2001/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:KATHODENSTRAHLRÖHRE MIT GETTERANORDNUNG[2001/05]
English:CATHODE RAY TUBE WITH GETTER ASSEMBLY[2001/05]
French:TUBE CATHODIQUE COMPRENANT UN ENSEMBLE SORPTION PAR GETTER[2001/05]
Entry into regional phase13.11.2000National basic fee paid 
19.02.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
19.02.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/16]
10.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.05.2004Fee for grant paid
21.05.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.04.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
02.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]FR2386901  (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1 * claims 1-10 *;
 [A]DE19542826  (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [US]) [A] 1 * claims 1-11 *;
 [A]EP0544351  (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1 * claims 1-5 *;
 [A]JPH10334835
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990331), vol. 1999, no. 03, [A] 1 * abstract *