EP1152969 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR WINDING A PAPER WEB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metso Paper, Inc. Fabianinkatu 9 A 00130 Helsinki / FI | [2001/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOUTONEN, Pauli Apupapintie 2 FIN-05400 Jokela / FI | [2001/46] | Representative(s) | Hakkila, Maini Annika, et al Forssén & Salomaa Oy Lautatarhankatu 8 B 00580 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2001/46] | Hakkila, Maini Annika, et al Forssén & Salomaa Oy, Yrjönkatu 30 00100 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 00901639.5 | 19.01.2000 | [2001/46] | WO2000FI00041 | Priority number, date | FI19990000124 | 22.01.1999 Original published format: FI 990124 | [2001/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0043308 | Date: | 27.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1152969 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1152969 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65H35/02, B26D5/06 | [2001/46] | CPC: |
B65H35/02 (EP,US);
B26D11/00 (EP,US);
B65H2511/10 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/10, B65H2220/01, B65H2220/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFWICKELN EINER PAPIERBAHN | [2001/46] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR WINDING A PAPER WEB | [2001/46] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D'ENROULEMENT D'UNE BANDE DE PAPIER | [2003/03] |
Former [2001/46] | PROC D ET APPAREIL D'ENROULEMENT D'UNE BANDE DE PAPIER | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.07.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/46] | 09.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 28.05.2003 | CH | 28.05.2003 | CY | 28.05.2003 | FI | 28.05.2003 | LI | 28.05.2003 | NL | 28.05.2003 | DK | 28.08.2003 | GR | 28.08.2003 | PT | 28.08.2003 | ES | 08.09.2003 | IE | 19.01.2004 | LU | 19.01.2004 | MC | 31.01.2004 | [2007/08] |
Former [2005/23] | BE | 28.05.2003 | |
CH | 28.05.2003 | ||
FI | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
DK | 28.08.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
IE | 19.01.2004 | ||
LU | 19.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | BE | 28.05.2003 | |
CH | 28.05.2003 | ||
FI | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
DK | 28.08.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
IE | 19.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | BE | 28.05.2003 | |
CH | 28.05.2003 | ||
FI | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
DK | 28.08.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/28] | BE | 28.05.2003 | |
CH | 28.05.2003 | ||
FI | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
DK | 28.08.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | CH | 28.05.2003 | |
FI | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
DK | 28.08.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | CH | 28.05.2003 | |
FI | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | CH | 28.05.2003 | |
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 28.05.2003 | |
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | CH | 28.05.2003 | |
LI | 28.05.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4484500 (REBA IMANTS [US], et al) [A] 1-17; | [A]US4629139 (SANDA AKIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-17; | [A]US4697755 (KATAOKA HIROSHI [JP])[A] 1-17; | [A]US4846416 (GUZZETTI NATALE [IT]) [A] 1-17; | [XA]EP0380438 (JAMES RIVER CORP [US]) [X] 10-11 [A] 1-2; | [A]EP0685304 (JUKI KK [JP]) [A] 1,10 |