blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1143814

EP1143814 - APPARATUS FOR GAS TREATMENT OF PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  01.06.2012
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
John Bean Technologies AB
Box 913
251 09 Helsingborg / SE
[2012/10]
Former [2001/42]For all designated states
FRIGOSCANDIA EQUIPMENT AKTIEBOLAG
P.O. Box 913
251 09 Helsingborg / SE
Inventor(s)01 / MALMBERG, Jonny
Nedre Holländaregatan 28
S-252 26 Helsingborg / SE
02 / BLIXT, Per
Planteringsvägen 50
S-252 29 Helsingborg / SE
03 / HOCKER, Jon, A.
12721 NE 129th Court F201
Kirkland, WA 98034 / US
04 / WILSON, Rick
P.O. Box 0074
Kent, WA 98035 / US
 [2001/42]
Representative(s)Andersson, Mikael Per Robert, et al
Awapatent AB
Box 1066
251 10 Helsingborg / SE
[N/P]
Former [2007/30]Andersson, Mikael Per Robert, et al
Awapatent AB Box 1066
251 10 Helsingborg / SE
Former [2001/42]Berglund, Gustav Arthur
AWAPATENT AB, Berga Allé 1
254 52 Helsingborg / SE
Application number, filing date00902267.420.01.2000
[2001/42]
WO2000SE00110
Priority number, dateSE1999000016620.01.1999         Original published format: SE 9900166
[2001/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0042869
Date:27.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1143814
Date:17.10.2001
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2001/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1143814
Date:29.10.2003
Language:EN
[2003/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE27.07.2000
ClassificationIPC:A23L3/00, B01J8/46
[2001/42]
CPC:
A21B1/48 (EP,US); B01J8/46 (KR); A21B1/245 (EP,US);
A23L3/0155 (EP,US); A23L3/18 (EP,US); A23L3/185 (EP,US);
A23L3/3409 (EP,US); A23L3/34095 (EP,US); A23L3/3418 (EP,US);
A23L3/3445 (EP,US); A23L3/36 (EP,US); A23L3/361 (EP,US);
A23L3/362 (EP,US); A23L3/40 (EP,US); F25D13/067 (EP,US);
F26B17/04 (EP,US); F26B21/02 (EP,US); F26B25/12 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/42]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:APPARAT ZUR GASBEHANDLUNG VON PRODUKTEN[2001/42]
English:APPARATUS FOR GAS TREATMENT OF PRODUCTS[2001/42]
French:APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT GAZEUX DE PRODUITS[2001/42]
Entry into regional phase26.06.2001National basic fee paid 
26.06.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
26.06.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.07.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
26.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/42]
10.09.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.08.2003Fee for grant paid
19.08.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP03008337.2  / EP1330959
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  28.07.2004  06.08.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Marel Salmon A/S
Bøgildmindevej 3
9400 Nørresundby / DK
Opponent's representative
Tellefsen, Jens J.
Patrade A/S
Ceresbyen 75
8000 Aarhus C / DK
 [N/P]
Former [2012/17]
Opponent(s)01  28.07.2004  06.08.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Marel Salmon A/S
Bøgildmindevej 3
9400 Nørresundby / DK
Opponent's representative
Tellefsen, Jens J.
Patrade A/S Fredens Torv 3A
8000 Aarhus C / DK
Former [2004/38]
Opponent(s)01  28.07.2004   
Camitech A/S
Juelstrupparken 14 Sorup
9530 Stovring / DK
Opponent's representative
Tellefsen, Jens J.
Patrade A/S, Fredens Torv 3A
8000 Aarhus C / DK
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
02.09.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.12.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.12.2007Date of oral proceedings
15.04.2008Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
15.04.2008Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
21.03.2012Legal effect of revocation of patent [ N /P ]
21.03.2012Legal effect of revocation of patent [2012/27]
21.03.2012Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition16.06.2008Appeal received No.  T1377/08
15.08.2008Statement of grounds filed
21.03.2012Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
Petition(s) for review:02.07.2012Petition for review received
 Number:  R0011/12
 for appeal No.  T1377/08-3305
 Petitioner:  APPR
19.07.2013Decision:  Petition for review obviously unsubstantiated only.
19.07.2013Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
07.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT29.10.2003
CH29.10.2003
CY29.10.2003
FI29.10.2003
LI29.10.2003
LU20.01.2004
GR29.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
SE21.01.2005
BE31.01.2007
IT20.01.2011
[2015/21]
Former [2008/04]AT29.10.2003
CH29.10.2003
CY29.10.2003
FI29.10.2003
LI29.10.2003
LU20.01.2004
GR29.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
SE21.01.2005
BE31.01.2007
Former [2007/08]AT29.10.2003
CH29.10.2003
CY29.10.2003
FI29.10.2003
LI29.10.2003
LU20.01.2004
GR29.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
SE21.01.2005
Former [2005/50]AT29.10.2003
CH29.10.2003
FI29.10.2003
LI29.10.2003
LU20.01.2004
GR29.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
SE21.01.2005
Former [2005/23]AT29.10.2003
CH29.10.2003
FI29.10.2003
LI29.10.2003
LU20.01.2004
GR29.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
Former [2005/02]AT29.10.2003
CH29.10.2003
FI29.10.2003
LI29.10.2003
GR29.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
Former [2004/33]AT29.10.2003
CH29.10.2003
FI29.10.2003
LI29.10.2003
GR29.01.2004
Former [2004/31]AT29.10.2003
FI29.10.2003
Former [2004/26]FI29.10.2003
Cited inInternational search[A]US3813895  (KLEE D, et al);
 [A]EP0249323  (BOC GROUP PLC [GB]);
 [X]US5408921  (PERSSON PER-OSKAR [US], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.