Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1258177

EP1258177 - THREE-PHASE PLASMA GENERATOR HAVING ADJUSTABLE ELECTRODES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.01.2010
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.02.2010  [2010/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SCIENTIFIC UTILIZATION, INC.
201 Electronic Boulevard S.W., P.O. Box 6787
Huntsville, AL 35824-0787 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/47]For all designated states
SCIENTIFIC UTILIZATION, INC.
201 Electronic Boulevard S.W., P.O. Box 6787
Huntsville, AL 35824-0787 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CHISM, Paul, E., Jr.
2518 Ben Poole Road S.E.
Decatur, AL 35603 / US
02 / GREENE, Hugh, W.
West Main Street
Somerville, AL 35670 / US
03 / RUTBERG, Philip G.
Vyoborgskoe shosse, 7-1-25
St.Petersburg, 191065 / RU
04 / SAFRONOV, Alexei A.
ul. Krylenko, 29-2, flat 22
St.Petersburg, 193230 / RU
05 / SHIRIAEV, Vasili, N.
ul. Khoshitina 13, flat 165
St.Petersburg, 194350 / RU
 [2002/47]
Representative(s)Davies, Gregory Mark , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
7th Floor
Churchill House
Churchill Way
Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/49]Davies, Gregory Mark , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Churchill House Churchill Way
Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB
Former [2009/21]Davies, Gregory Mark , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff
CF10 2HH / GB
Former [2002/47]Strachan, Victoria Jane
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, Alexandra House, 1 Alexandra Road
Swansea SA1 5ED / GB
Application number, filing date00902432.418.01.2000
[2002/47]
WO2000US01123
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0154464
Date:26.07.2001
Language:EN
[2001/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1258177
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2001
[2002/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US26.07.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.02.2007
ClassificationInternational:H05H1/36, H05H1/44
[2007/10]
Former International [2002/47]H05H1/36
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/47]
TitleGerman:DREIPHASEN-PLASMAGENERATOR MIT EINSTELLBAREN ELEKTRODEN[2002/47]
English:THREE-PHASE PLASMA GENERATOR HAVING ADJUSTABLE ELECTRODES[2002/47]
French:GENERATEUR DE PLASMA TRIPHASE A ELECTRODES AJUSTABLES[2002/47]
Entry into regional phase15.08.2002National basic fee paid 
15.08.2002Search fee paid 
15.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
15.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.04.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
15.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/47]
13.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/06]
21.09.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2010/06]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
07.04.2008Request for further processing filed
07.04.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
18.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
28.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
11.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
27.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
26.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
31.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200304   M06   Fee paid on   18.03.2003
31.01.200809   M06   Fee paid on   31.07.2008
31.01.200910   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5801489  (CHISM JR PAUL E [US], et al) [Y] 1-6,12,13,16-23,28,29,32 * columns 3,5; figures 1-4,6; claim 11 *;
 [Y]US2964678  (REID JAMES W) [Y] 1-6,12,13,16-23,28,29,32 * columns 1,5,6; figures 5,6 *;
 [A]US3714390  (FOEX M, et al) [A] 1 * figures 12,13 *;
 [A]EP0526560  (HYPERTHERM INC [US]) [A] 1 * figures 3A,3B,3C *
International search[Y]US5801489  (CHISM JR PAUL E [US], et al);
 [Y]US3894573  (PATON BORIS EVGENIEVICH, et al);
 [Y]US3869593  (NEW GEORGE WILLIAM, et al);
 [A]US4788408  (WLODARCZYK JANUSZ [US], et al);
 [A]  - KISELEV A. ET AL., "High-Power Three-Phase Plasma Source", TEPLOFIZIKA VYSOKIKH TEMPERATUR, LENINGRAD, (197407), vol. 12, no. 4, pages 827 - 837, XP002923584