Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1150632

EP1150632 - SURGICAL DEVICE FOR LAMELLAR CUTTING OF THE CORNEA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.09.2003
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.09.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.11.2003  [2003/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HumanOptics AG
Spardorfer Strasse 150
91054 Erlangen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/45]For all designated states
HumanOptics AG
Spardorfer Strasse 150
91054 Erlangen / DE
Former [2001/45]For all designated states
Hanna, Khalil
5 rue Cognacq-Jay
75007 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Hanna, Khalil
5, rue Cognacq Jay
75007 Paris / FR
 [2002/45]
Former [2001/45]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Robert, Jean-Pierre , et al
Cabinet Boettcher 16, rue Médéric
75017 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/45]Robert, Jean-Pierre , et al
CABINET BOETTCHER, 22, rue du Général Foy
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date00902711.107.02.2000
[2001/45]
WO2000FR00276
Priority number, dateFR1999000149209.02.1999         Original published format: FR 9901492
[2001/45]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0047146
Date:17.08.2000
Language:FR
[2000/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1150632
Date:07.11.2001
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2000
[2001/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1150632
Date:13.11.2002
Language:FR
[2002/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61F9/013
[2001/45]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/46]
Former [2001/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:CHIRURGISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG EINES LAMELLÄREN HORNHAUTSCHNITTES[2001/45]
English:SURGICAL DEVICE FOR LAMELLAR CUTTING OF THE CORNEA[2001/45]
French:APPAREIL CHIRURGICAL POUR REALISER UNE DECOUPE LAMELLAIRE DE LA CORNEE[2001/45]
Entry into regional phase05.07.2001National basic fee paid 
05.07.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
05.07.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.08.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/45]
22.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.05.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.08.2002Fee for grant paid
20.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYA]WO9827901  (INST BARRAQUER DE AMERICA [CO], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 17, line 30 - page 18, line 16; figures 5-5D * * page 32, line 16 - page 35, line 17; figures 26-33C * [Y] 11 [A] 7;
 [Y]WO9818517  (HELLENKAMP JOHANN F [US]) [Y] 11 * abstract * * page 15, line 2 - line 15; figure 3C *;
 [A]WO9406356  (ROZAKIS GEORGE W [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 10, line 30 - page 11, line 5; figures 3-6 *;
 [A]WO9810716  (MEDJET INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 12, line 22 - page 14, line 2; figures 3,4 *;
 [A]US4173980  (CURTIN BRIAN J [US]) [A] 1,4,8 * column 6, line 50 - line 67; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]WO9531143  (KOEPNICK RUSSELL G [US]) [A] 9,10 * page 8, line 26 - line 33 *;
 [A]WO9903433  (KERAVISION INC [US], et al) [A] 11 * page 13, line 11 - line 17; figures 9,10 *;
 [PA]EP0895765  (HANNA KHALIL [FR]) [PA] 1-3,8,11 * the whole document *