blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1167268

EP1167268 - SAFETY DEVICE FOR WORK ON ELEVATOR CAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.10.2006
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2008Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 24.12.2008  [2008/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[2006/18]
Former [2002/01]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / ISHII, Toshiaki, Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
02 / ITO, Kazumasa, Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
03 / TOMIDOKORO, Makoto
Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha 2-2-3 Marunouchi
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
 [2002/01]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/01]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date00902881.209.02.2000
[2002/01]
WO2000JP00717
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0158796
Date:16.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1167268
Date:02.01.2002
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2002/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1167268
Date:07.12.2005
Language:EN
[2005/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP16.08.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.12.2002
ClassificationIPC:B66B5/00
[2002/01]
CPC:
B66B5/0081 (EP); B66B5/005 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2004/22]
Former [2002/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:SCHUTZGERAET, UM AUF EINER AUFZUGSKABINE ZU ARBEITEN[2002/01]
English:SAFETY DEVICE FOR WORK ON ELEVATOR CAGE[2002/01]
French:DISPOSITIF DE SECURITE POUR TRAVAILLER SUR UNE CAGE D'ASCENSEUR[2002/01]
Entry into regional phase17.10.2001Translation filed 
17.10.2001National basic fee paid 
17.10.2001Search fee paid 
17.10.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
17.10.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.10.2001Examination requested  [2002/01]
17.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.06.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.09.2005Fee for grant paid
23.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04006916.3  / EP1431228
EP04027990.3  / EP1524232
Opposition(s)08.09.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
24.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
21.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR07.12.2005
GB07.03.2006
[2008/52]
Former [2008/40]FR28.02.2006
GB07.03.2006
Former [2007/27]GB07.03.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH08113440  ;
 [A]US5025895  (LEONE RICHARD J [US], et al) [A] 6 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960930), vol. 1996, no. 09, & JP08113440 A 19960507 (MITSUBISHI DENKI BILL TECHNO SERVICE KK) [A] 6 * abstract *
International search[Y]JPS483961Y  ;
 [Y]JPH11335018  (TOSHIBA ELEVATOR CO LTD);
 [Y]JP2862713B  ;
 [Y]EP0905081  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]);
 [Y]JPH0246788U  ;
 [A]EP0926093  (THYSSEN AUFZUEGE GMBH [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.