Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1140840

EP1140840 - -G(V)-CARBOXYARYL SUBSTITUTED DIPHENYL UREAS AS RAF KINASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.01.2007
Database last updated on 23.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.12.2007Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT
published on 23.01.2008  [2008/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayer Pharmaceuticals Corp.
400 Morgan Lane
West Haven, CT 06516 / US
[2005/11]
Former [2001/41]For all designated states
Bayer Corporation
100 Bayer Road
Pittsburgh, PA 15205 / US
Inventor(s)01 / RIEDL, Bernd
Von-der-Glotz-Strasse 7
D-42329 Wuppertal / DE
02 / DUMAS, Jacques
821 Beechwood Road
Orange, CT 06477 / US
03 / KHIRE, Uday
101 Tanglewood Drive
Hamden, CT 06518 / US
04 / LOWINGER, Timothy, B.
203, 5-7, Chitose-Cho
Nishinomiya City Hyogo 662-0046 / JP
05 / SCOTT, William, J.
210 Saddle Hill Drive
Guilford, CT 06437 / US
06 / SMITH, Roger, A.
65 Winterhill Road
Madison, CT 06443 / US
07 / WOOD, Jill, E.
72 Pickwick Road
Hamden, CT 06517 / US
08 / MONAHAN, Mary-Katherine
134 Park Avenue
Hamden, CT 06517 / US
09 / NATERO, Reina
113 Edgecomb Street
Hamden, CT 06518 / US
10 / RENICK, Joel
11 Wall Street 4
Milford, CT 06460 / US
11 / SIBLEY, Robert, N.
1187 Mt. Carmel Avenue
North Haven, CT 06473 / US
 [2001/41]
Representative(s)Weiss, Wolfgang , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/41]Weiss, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Chem. Dr. , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Application number, filing date00903239.212.01.2000
[2001/41]
WO2000US00648
Priority number, dateUS19990115877P13.01.1999         Original published format: US 115877 P
US1999025726625.02.1999         Original published format: US 257266
US1999042522822.10.1999         Original published format: US 425228
[2001/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0042012
Date:20.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1140840
Date:10.10.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2000
[2001/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1140840
Date:22.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US20.07.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:C07D211/78, C07D211/72, A61K31/33, A61K31/54, A61K31/535, A61K31/17, C07C275/20, C07C275/22, C07C275/24, C07C275/28
[2001/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/41]
Extension statesAL09.07.2001
LT09.07.2001
LV09.07.2001
MK09.07.2001
RO09.07.2001
SI09.07.2001
TitleGerman:-G(V)-CARBOXYARYL SUBSTITUIERTE DIPHENYL HARNSTOFFE ALS RAF KINASE INHIBITOREN[2001/41]
English:-G(V)-CARBOXYARYL SUBSTITUTED DIPHENYL UREAS AS RAF KINASE INHIBITORS[2001/41]
French:DIPHENYLUREES A SUBSTITUANTS -G(V)-CARBOXYARYLES, INHIBITRICES DE KINASE RAF[2001/41]
Entry into regional phase09.07.2001National basic fee paid 
09.07.2001Search fee paid 
09.07.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
09.07.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.08.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
09.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/41]
31.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.07.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
11.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.01.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.01.2006Fee for grant paid
17.01.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP05028442.1  / EP1690853
Opposition(s)27.12.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/09]
Request for further processing for:11.09.2003Request for further processing filed
19.09.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
24.09.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
26.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
12.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200405   M06   Fee paid on   26.03.2004
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2008/04]
Former [2007/35]IT22.03.2006
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9920617  (UPJOHN CO [US], et al) [X] 1-59,61 *claims, abstract and in particular, compounds n, o, p and examples 1-17*;
 [X]US5447957  (ADAMS JERRY L [US], et al) [X] 1-59,61 *abstract; columns 1-5 and the examples; in particular, the compounds in column 7, lines 10-19, 23-25, 29-32, 36 and 37 and examples 2,4,5 and 6 *;
 [X]US4973675  (ISRAEL MERVYN [US], et al) [X] 1-67 *abstract; columns 1 and 2 and in table 1, the urea derivative AD 334*;
 JPH0223337  [ ] (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND);
 JPH0222650  [ ] (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND);
 [X]WO9932463  (BAYER AG [US]) [X] 1-67 * page 1 - page 5; claims 1-21; tables 1-5 *;
 [X]WO9533458  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-67 * page 1 - page 4; claims 1-13 *;
 [A]WO0041698  (BAYER AG [US], et al) [A] 1-67 * page 1 - page 8; claims 1-37; tables 1-7 *
 [X]  - RAPOSO, CESAR ET AL, "Catalysis of nucleophilic addition of pyrrolidine to 2-(5H)-furanone through chromenone cleft-type receptors", TETRAHEDRON LETT. (1996), 37(38), 6947-6950, XP002205797 [X] 1-59,61 *abstract and compounds 9 and 10*

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-4039(96)01524-9
 [X]  - YAGI, TOSHIHIKO ET AL, "Silver halide photographic material containing phenolic cyan coupler and colorless cyan coupler", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 113:142130, URL: STN, XP002205798 [X] 1-59,61 * abstract *
 [X]  - MIZUKURA, NOBORU ET AL, "Silver halide color photographic material containing a cyan coupler of 2-ureido-phenol type to improve dye developability and remove leuco cyan dye", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 113:106314, URL: STN, XP002205799 [X] 1-59,61 * abstract *
 [X]  - JEFFCOAT, A. ROBERT ET AL, "The metabolism and toxicity of halogenated carbanilides. Biliary metabolites of 3,4,4'-trichlorocarbanilide and 3-trifluoromethyl-4,4'- dichlorocarbanilide in the rat", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 87:62295, URL: STN, XP002202286 [X] 1-59,61 * abstract *
    [] - DRUG METAB. DISPOS. (1977), 5(2), 157-66 [ ] *compounds with rn:63348-38-9 and 63348-30-1*
International search[Y]WO9852558  (BAYER AG [US], et al);
 [Y]WO9852559  (BAYER AG [US], et al);
 WO9932111  [ ] (BAYER AG [US]);
 WO9932110  [ ] (BAYER AG [US]);
 WO9717329  [ ] (KIRIN BREWERY [JP], et al);
 JPS57185219  [ ] (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD);
 CH479557  [ ] (WANDER AG DR A [CH]);
 WO9932436  [ ] (BAYER AG [US]);
 [YP]  - DUMAS ET. AL., "Inhibition of P38 kinase activity using substituted heterocyclic ureas.", DATABASE HCAPLUS, Database accession no. 1999:425745, XP002949801
 [YP]  - DUMAS ET. AL., "Preparation of pyrazolyl aryl areas and related compounds as P38 kinase inhibitors.", DATABASE HCAPLUS, Database accession no. 1999:425744, XP002949802
 [X]  - KURIK M. V. ET. AL., "Optical properties of segmented oligourethane with azomethine terminal fragments.", DATABASE HCAPLUS, Database accession no. 1997:624629, XP002949803
    [] - VYSOKOMOL. SOEDIN, (1996), vol. 38, no. 12, pages 2038 - 2041,
 [X]  - KUBO ET. AL., "Preparation quinoline and quinazoline derivaties inhibiting platelet-derived growth factor receptor autophosphorylation.", DATABASE HCAPLUS, Database accession no. 1997:414195, XP002949804
 [X]  - WINKLER ET. AL., "Inhibitors of coenzyme A-independent transacylase induce apoptosis in human HL-60 cells,", DATABASE HCAPLUS, Database accession no. 1996:702444, XP002948805

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1139/cjm-46-3-189
    [] - JOURNAL OF PHARMACOL, (1996), vol. 279, no. 2, pages 956 - 966,
 [X]  - CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD., JAPAN., "Antitumor Benzophenone derivaties.", DATABASE HCAPLUS, Database accession no. 1983:78152, XP002949806
 [A]  - HIRT ET. AL., "Tuberculostatic and cancerstatic polybasic ureas.", DATABASE HCAPLUS, Database accession no. 1970:79046, XP002949807
 [XP]  - MILLER ET. AL., "Inhibition of raf kinase using symmetrical and unsymmetrical substituted diphenyl ureas.", DATABASE HCAPLUS, Database accession no. 1999:421642, XP002948808
 [X]  - DEARDEN ET. AL., "Quantitative structure-biodegradability studies: an investigation of the MITI aromatic compound database.", DATABASE HCAPLUS, Database accession no. 1997:613699, XP002949809
    [] - NATO ASI SRV., (1996), vol. 23, pages 93 - 104,
 [X]  - BONWICK ET. AL., "Production of murine monoclonal antibodies against sulcofuron and flucofuran by in-vitro immunization.", DATABASE HCAPLUS, Database accession no. 1996:551868, XP002949810
    [] - JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, (1996), vol. 196, no. 2, pages 163 - 173,