EP1173265 - SONIC IMPINGING JET CRYSTALLIZATION APPARATUS AND PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/51] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company P.O. Box 4000 Princeton, NJ 08543-4000 / US | ||
Former [2002/04] | For all designated states BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY P.O. Box 4000 Princeton, NJ 08543-4000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDRUD, Mark, D. 34 Peachtree Road Basking Ridge, NJ 07920 / US | 02 /
KIM, Soojin 21 Linden Avenue West Orange, NJ 07052 / US | 03 /
WEI, Chenkou 44 Windsor Drive Princeton, NJ 08550 / US | [2002/04] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/04] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00903377.0 | 20.01.2000 | [2002/04] | WO2000US01461 | Priority number, date | US19990117878P | 29.01.1999 Original published format: US 117878 P | [2002/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0044468 | Date: | 03.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1173265 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1173265 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.08.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B01D9/00, B01D9/02, B01J19/10, B01J19/26 | [2002/46] | CPC: |
C30B7/10 (EP,US);
B01D9/0036 (EP,US);
B01D9/005 (EP,US);
B01F25/23 (EP,US);
B01F25/25 (EP,US);
B01F31/83 (EP,US);
B01F31/85 (EP,US);
B01F33/822 (EP,US);
B01J19/10 (EP,US);
B01J19/18 (EP,US);
B01J4/001 (EP,US);
C30B29/58 (EP,US);
C30B7/00 (EP,US);
B01F27/00 (EP,US);
B01F33/30 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/04] | B01D9/00, B01D9/02, B01J19/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR MIT ULTRASCHALL BEAUFSCHLAGTEN STRAHLKRISTALLISATION | [2002/04] | English: | SONIC IMPINGING JET CRYSTALLIZATION APPARATUS AND PROCESS | [2002/04] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE CRISTALLISATION PAR ULTRASONS PAR JETS CONTRARIES | [2002/04] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2001 | Search fee paid | 23.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.08.2001 | Examination requested [2002/04] | 16.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/35] | IT | 21.12.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2276567 (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK [GB]) [Y] 1-17 * page 3, lines 4-19; figure - *; | [Y]US5578279 (DAUER RICHARD [US], et al) [Y] 1-17 * column 1, lines 6-24 * * column 2, line 18 - column 3, line 49; figure 1 *; | [A]DE19617085 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-17* column 3, line 46 - column 5, line 36 * | International search | [A]US2876083 (FRANZ PRIETL); | [Y]EP0275607 (NOBEL KEMI AB [SE]); | [A]CH671166 (FERSHAN HOLDING S A); | [Y]US5314506 (MIDLER JR MICHAEL [US], et al) | [A] - LIU P. et al., "The Use of Continuously Impinging Jets to Control Crystallization and Particle Size in Pharmaceutical Manufacturing", presented at the American Institute of Chemical Engineers, National Meeting on November 1990 in Chicago, Illinois, English abstract (only). |