Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1161940

EP1161940 - TABLETS AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING TABLETS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.04.2006
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD.
6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8185 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/50]For all designated states
KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD.
6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8185 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / WATANABE, Yasushi
1188 Shimotogari, Nagaizumi-cho
Sunto-gun, Shizuoka 411-8731 / JP
02 / MORIMOTO, Kiyoshi
1188 Shimotogari, Nagaizumi-cho
Sunto-gun, Shizuoka 411-8731 / JP
03 / IWASE, Yuji
1188 Shimotogari, Nagaizumi-cho
Sunto-gun, Shizuoka 411-8731 / JP
04 / HIRUTA, Satoru
1188 Shimotogari, Nagaizumi-cho
Sunto-gun, Shizuoka 411-8731 / JP
 [2001/50]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2001/50]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date00903982.716.02.2000
[2001/50]
WO2000JP00870
Priority number, dateJP1999003929417.02.1999         Original published format: JP 3929499
[2001/50]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0048575
Date:24.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1161940
Date:12.12.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2000
[2001/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1161940
Date:08.06.2005
Language:EN
[2005/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP24.08.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/20, A61K47/26
[2001/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/50]
Extension statesAL17.09.2001
LT17.09.2001
LV17.09.2001
MK17.09.2001
RO17.09.2001
SI17.09.2001
TitleGerman:TABLETTEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR TABLETTENHERSTELLUNG[2001/50]
English:TABLETS AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING TABLETS[2001/50]
French:COMPRIMES ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE COMPRIMES[2001/50]
Entry into regional phase17.09.2001Translation filed 
17.09.2001National basic fee paid 
17.09.2001Search fee paid 
17.09.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
17.09.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.02.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
17.09.2001Examination requested  [2001/50]
20.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
02.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.11.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.03.2005Fee for grant paid
08.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.03.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
01.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
CY08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
DK08.09.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
IE16.02.2006
LU28.02.2006
MC28.02.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2007/12]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
DK08.09.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
IE16.02.2006
LU28.02.2006
MC28.02.2006
Former [2007/08]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
DK08.09.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
LU28.02.2006
MC28.02.2006
Former [2006/44]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
DK08.09.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
MC28.02.2006
Former [2006/26]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
DK08.09.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
Former [2006/22]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
Former [2006/14]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
Former [2006/13]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
SE08.09.2005
Former [2005/52]FI08.06.2005
SE08.09.2005
Former [2005/50]SE08.09.2005
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5660860  (FIELDEN KRYSTYNA ELZBIETA [GB]) [Y] 1,2,5,7-9,11,12 * column 7, line 46 - column 8, line 12 *
 [Y]  BAUER K.H. ET AL., Pharmazeutische Technologie, STUTTGART, GEORG THIEME VERLAG, XP002204249 [Y] 1,2,5,7-9,11,12 * page 300; table 14.1 *
International search[X]EP0553777  (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]);
 [X]EP0745382  (YAMANOUCHI PHARMA CO LTD [JP]);
 [X]JPH1112161  (TANABE SEIYAKU CO);
 [XP]JPH11263723  (DAINIPPON PHARMACEUTICAL CO)