Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1163601

EP1163601 - DISTRIBUTION OF MUSICAL PRODUCTS OVER THE INTERNET [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.01.2006
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.01.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.03.2006  [2006/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fritsch, Bernhard
220 East 65th Street
New York, NY 10021 / US
[2003/50]
Former [2001/51]For all designated states
MCY Music World, Inc.
1133 Avenue of the Americas - 28th Floor
New York, NY 10036 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FRITSCH, Bernhard
220 East 65th Street
New York, NY 10021 / US
 [2001/51]
Representative(s)Carpenter, David
Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham
B1 1TT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/51]Carpenter, David
MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway
Birmingham B1 1TT / GB
Application number, filing date00904551.924.01.2000
[2001/51]
WO2000US01832
Priority number, dateUS19990116778P22.01.1999         Original published format: US 116778 P
US19990116780P22.01.1999         Original published format: US 116780 P
US19990116910P22.01.1999         Original published format: US 116910 P
US19990116917P22.01.1999         Original published format: US 116917 P
US19990116918P22.01.1999         Original published format: US 116918 P
US19990116779P22.01.1999         Original published format: US 116779 P
US2000048737218.01.2000         Original published format: US 487372
US2000048737318.01.2000         Original published format: US 487373
[2003/21]
Former [2001/51]US19990116778P22.01.1999
US19990116780P22.01.1999
US19990116910P22.01.1999
US19990116917P22.01.1999
US19990116918P22.01.1999
US20000116779P18.01.2000
US2000048737218.01.2000
US2000048737318.01.2000
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0043904
Date:27.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1163601
Date:19.12.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2000
[2001/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US27.07.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/00, G06F17/60
[2002/18]
Former International [2001/51]G06F17/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/51]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERTEILUNG VON MUSIKALISCHEN PRODUKTEN ÜBER DAS INTERNET[2001/51]
English:DISTRIBUTION OF MUSICAL PRODUCTS OVER THE INTERNET[2001/51]
French:DISTRIBUTION DE PRODUITS MUSICAUX PAR INTERNET[2001/51]
Entry into regional phase17.08.2001National basic fee paid 
17.08.2001Search fee paid 
17.08.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
17.08.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.08.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
17.08.2001Examination requested  [2001/51]
19.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/09]
07.09.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
24.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
28.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200304   M06   Fee paid on   24.07.2003
31.01.200506   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No Search
International search[XP]US5930765  (MARTIN JOHN R [US])