Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1159429

EP1159429 - PSA AND KLK-2 SPLICING VARIANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.06.2006
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Compugen Ltd.
72 Pinchas Rosen Street
69512 Tel Aviv / IL
[N/P]
Former [2001/49]For all designated states
Compugen Ltd.
Pinchas Rosen Street 72
69512 Tel Aviv / IL
Inventor(s)01 / SAVITZKY, Kinneret
Metodela Street 44
69548 Tel Aviv / IL
02 / MINTZ, Liat
Harav Kook Street 14
47254 Ramat Hasharon / IL
03 / DAVID, Anat
Afner Street 11
53292 Givataim / IL
04 / AZAR, Idit
Hankin Street 2
76354 Rehovot / IL
 [2001/49]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2001/49]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date00905240.818.02.2000
[2001/49]
WO2000IL00102
Priority number, dateIL1999012858718.02.1999         Original published format: IL 12858799
IL1999012943914.04.1999         Original published format: IL 12943999
IL1999013136311.08.1999         Original published format: IL 13136399
[2001/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0049158
Date:24.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/34]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1159429
Date:05.12.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2000
[2001/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/55, C12N9/64, C07K16/40, A61K38/48
[2001/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/49]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:SPLEISSVARIANTEN VON PSA UND KLK-2[2001/49]
English:PSA AND KLK-2 SPLICING VARIANTS[2001/49]
French:NOUVEL ACIDE NUCLEIQUE ET SEQUENCES D'ACIDES AMINES[2001/49]
Entry into regional phase17.09.2001National basic fee paid 
17.09.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
17.09.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.09.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.09.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.09.2001Examination requested  [2001/49]
08.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.01.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/30]
23.02.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
01.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
16.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200607   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9212430  (ENDORECHERCHE INC [CA]) [A] 19-28,31-35 * claim 1 *;
 [A]WO9846795  (BAYLOR COLLEGE MEDICINE [US], et al) [A] 1-28,31-35 * claims 2,21,22 *
 [A]  - RIEGMAN P H J ET AL, "MOLECULAR CLONING AND CHARACTERIZATION OF NOVEL PROSTATE ANTIGEN CDNA'S", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS,US,ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, (19880830), vol. 155, no. 1, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 181 - 188, XP002037458 [A] 1-28,31-35 * page 182, paragraph 1 * * page 187, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0006-291X(88)81066-0
 [A]  - RIEGMAN, P.H.J. ET AL., "Characterization of the Prostate-Specific Antigen Gene: A Novel Human Kallikrein-Like Gene.", BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1989), vol. 159, no. 1, pages 95 - 102, XP002142073 [A] 1-28,31-35 * page 95, paragraph 2 - page 96, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-291X(89)92409-1
 [A]  - BAFFA, R. ET AL., "A Comparative Analysis of Prostate-Specific Antigen Gene Sequence in Benign and Malignant Prostate Tissue.", UROLOGY, (199606), vol. 47, no. 6, pages 795 - 800, XP000915073 [A] 1-28,31-35 * page 788, column 2, paragraph 4 - page 799, column 1, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0090-4295(96)00060-X
 [A]  - RIEGMAN, P.H.J. , ET AL., "Identification of androgen-regulated expression of two major human glandular kallikrein-1 (hGK-1) mRNA species.", MOL. CELL. ENDOCRINOL., (1991), vol. 76, pages 181 - 190, XP000915066 [A] 1-28,31-35 * page 188, column 1, paragraph 3 - column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 189, column 2, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0303-7207(91)90272-T
 [A]  - THIOUNN, N. ET AL., "Positive Prostate-Specific Antigen Circulating Cells Detected by Reverse Transcriptase-Polymerase Chain Reaction Does Not Imply The Presence of Prostatic Micrometastases", UROLOGY, (1997), vol. 50, pages 245 - 250, XP000915071 [A] 1-28,31-35 * page 248, column 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0090-4295(97)00272-0