Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1147101

EP1147101 - REVERSE HYDROXAMATE INHIBITORS OF MATRIX METALLOPROTEINASES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.09.2003
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.11.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 05.12.2012  [2012/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
100 Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park, IL 60064-3500 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/36]For all designated states
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
CHAD 0377/AP6D-2 100 Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park IL 60064-3500 / US
Former [2002/47]For all designated states
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
CHAD 0377/AP6D-2, 100 Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park, IL 60064-6050 / US
Former [2001/43]For all designated states
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
CHAD 0377/AP6D-2, 100 Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park, IL 60064-6050 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CURTIN, Michael, L.
8625 113th Avenue
Pleasant Prairie, WI 53158 / US
02 / DAI, Yujia
1557 Camden Drive
Gurnee, IL 60031 / US
03 / DAVIDSEN, Steven, K.
1002 Gracewood Drive
Libertyville, IL 60048 / US
04 / HEYMAN, Howard, R.
3642 N. Keeler Avenue
Chicago, IL 60641 / US
05 / HOLMES, James, H.
1239 Pine Grove Street
Gurnee, IL 60031 / US
06 / MICHAELIDES, Michael, R.
4452 W. Gavin Lane
Libertyville, IL 60048 / US
07 / STEINMAN, Douglas, H.
7001 Foster Street
Morton Grove, IL 60053 / US
 [2001/43]
Representative(s)Modiano, Guido , et al
Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/43]Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date00905758.927.01.2000
[2001/43]
WO2000US02038
Priority number, dateUS1999023908727.01.1999         Original published format: US 239087
[2001/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0044739
Date:03.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1147101
Date:24.10.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2000
[2001/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1147101
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:C07D317/28, C07D307/14, C07D207/48, C07D207/09, C07D263/04, A61K31/335, A61P35/04
[2001/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/43]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RO11.07.2001
SI11.07.2001
TitleGerman:UMGEKEHRT HYDROXAMAT INHIBITOREN VON MATRIX METALLOPROTEINASEN[2001/43]
English:REVERSE HYDROXAMATE INHIBITORS OF MATRIX METALLOPROTEINASES[2001/43]
French:COMPOSES D'HYDROXAMATE INVERSE UTILISES COMME INHIBITEURS DE METALLOPROTEASES MATRICIELLES[2001/43]
Entry into regional phase11.07.2001National basic fee paid 
11.07.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
11.07.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.08.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
11.07.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/43]
22.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.08.2002Fee for grant paid
12.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipMC31.01.2003
[2012/49]
Former [2005/02]MC31.01.2003
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0780386  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [A] 1,18 * claim - *;
 [A]  - S.WNUK ET AL., "NUCLEIC ACID RELATED COMPOUNDS.67.", CANADIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY., NATIONAL RESEARCH COUNCIL. OTTAWA., CA, (1991), vol. 69, no. 12, ISSN 0008-4042, pages 2104 - 11, XP002140818 [A] 1,18 * page 2104; examples 12B,13 *