Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1157058

EP1157058 - METHOD OF PREPARING NORBORNENE SULFONAMIDE POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.04.2004
Database last updated on 20.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.07.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 29.08.2007  [2007/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO., LTD.
5-8, Higashi-Shinagawa 2-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 140-0002 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/21]For all designated states
SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO., LTD.
5-8, Higashi-Shinagawa 2-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 140-0002 / JP
Former [2002/34]For all designated states
Goodrich Corporation
Four Coliseum Centre, 2730 West Tyvola Road
Charlotte, North Carolina 28217 / US
Former [2001/48]For all designated states
The B.F. Goodrich Company
3 Coliseum Centre, 2550 W. Tyvola Road
Charlotte, NC 28217-4543 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JAYARAMAN, Saikumar
707 West Hemlock Way
Chandler, AZ 85248 / US
02 / VICARI, Richard
9937 Huntington Park Drive
Strongsville, OH 44136 / US
03 / RHODES, Larry, F.
3036 Vincent Road
Silver Lake, OH 44224 / US
 [2002/03]
Former [2001/48]01 / JAYARAMAN, Saikumar
12185 Waywood Drive
Twinsburg, OH 44087 / US
02 / VICARI, Richard
9937 Huntington Park Drive
Strongsville, OH 44136 / US
03 / RHODES, Larry, F.
3036 Vincent Road
Silver Lake, OH 44224 / US
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/48]von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date00905995.704.02.2000
[2001/48]
WO2000US03060
Priority number, dateUS19990118936P05.02.1999         Original published format: US 118936 P
US2000049735603.02.2000         Original published format: US 497356
[2002/37]
Former [2001/48]US19990118936P05.02.1999
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0046267
Date:10.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1157058
Date:28.11.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2000
[2001/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1157058
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:C08G61/08
[2001/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/48]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON NORBORNENSULFONAMIDPOLYMEREN[2001/48]
English:METHOD OF PREPARING NORBORNENE SULFONAMIDE POLYMERS[2001/48]
French:PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE POLYMERES DE SULFONAMIDE DE NORBORNENE[2001/48]
Entry into regional phase03.08.2001National basic fee paid 
03.08.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
03.08.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.08.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
03.08.2001Examination requested  [2001/48]
04.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.02.2003Fee for grant paid
27.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.06.2003
BE25.06.2003
CH25.06.2003
CY25.06.2003
FI25.06.2003
IT25.06.2003
LI25.06.2003
NL25.06.2003
DK25.09.2003
GR25.09.2003
PT25.09.2003
SE25.09.2003
ES22.12.2003
IE04.02.2004
LU04.02.2004
MC28.02.2004
[2007/35]
Former [2007/08]AT25.06.2003
BE25.06.2003
CH25.06.2003
CY25.06.2003
FI25.06.2003
LI25.06.2003
NL25.06.2003
DK25.09.2003
GR25.09.2003
PT25.09.2003
SE25.09.2003
ES22.12.2003
IE04.02.2004
LU04.02.2004
MC28.02.2004
Former [2005/23]AT25.06.2003
BE25.06.2003
CH25.06.2003
FI25.06.2003
LI25.06.2003
NL25.06.2003
DK25.09.2003
GR25.09.2003
PT25.09.2003
SE25.09.2003
ES22.12.2003
IE04.02.2004
LU04.02.2004
MC28.02.2004
Former [2005/19]AT25.06.2003
BE25.06.2003
CH25.06.2003
FI25.06.2003
LI25.06.2003
NL25.06.2003
DK25.09.2003
GR25.09.2003
PT25.09.2003
SE25.09.2003
ES22.12.2003
IE04.02.2004
MC28.02.2004
Former [2005/02]AT25.06.2003
BE25.06.2003
CH25.06.2003
FI25.06.2003
LI25.06.2003
NL25.06.2003
DK25.09.2003
GR25.09.2003
PT25.09.2003
SE25.09.2003
ES22.12.2003
MC28.02.2004
Former [2004/29]AT25.06.2003
BE25.06.2003
CH25.06.2003
FI25.06.2003
LI25.06.2003
NL25.06.2003
DK25.09.2003
GR25.09.2003
PT25.09.2003
SE25.09.2003
ES22.12.2003
Former [2004/28]AT25.06.2003
BE25.06.2003
CH25.06.2003
FI25.06.2003
LI25.06.2003
NL25.06.2003
GR25.09.2003
PT25.09.2003
SE25.09.2003
ES22.12.2003
Former [2004/13]AT25.06.2003
CH25.06.2003
FI25.06.2003
LI25.06.2003
NL25.06.2003
GR25.09.2003
PT25.09.2003
SE25.09.2003
ES22.12.2003
Former [2004/10]AT25.06.2003
CH25.06.2003
FI25.06.2003
LI25.06.2003
NL25.06.2003
GR25.09.2003
SE25.09.2003
Former [2004/05]AT25.06.2003
CH25.06.2003
FI25.06.2003
LI25.06.2003
GR25.09.2003
Former [2004/03]AT25.06.2003
CH25.06.2003
LI25.06.2003
GR25.09.2003
Former [2004/02]CH25.06.2003
LI25.06.2003
GR25.09.2003
Former [2004/01]CH25.06.2003
LI25.06.2003
Cited inInternational search[AD]WO9733198  (GOODRICH CO B F [US]) [AD] 1-21 * claims 2,6,17 *;
 [PX]JPH11184090
 [PX]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991029), vol. 1999, no. 12, [PX] 1-21 * abstract *