Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1250632

EP1250632 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE OVERALL EQUIPMENT EFFECTIVENESS OF PRODUCTION PLANTS, FAILURE EVENTS AND FAILURE CAUSES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.11.2005
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABB Research Ltd.
Affolternstrasse 44
8050 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [2002/43]For all designated states
ABB Research Ltd.
Affolternstrasse 44
8050 Zürich / CH
Inventor(s)01 / KALLELA, Jari
Avenue Ernest Solvay 24
B-1310 La Hulpe / BE
02 / VOLLMAR, Gerhard
Raiffeisenstrasse 12
D-67149 Meckenheim / DE
03 / GREULICH, Manuel
Insel 7
D-77709 Oberwolfach / DE
04 / MILANOVIC, Raiko
Biethstrasse 20/1
D-69121 Heidelberg / DE
 [2002/49]
Former [2002/43]01 / KALLELA, Jari
Avenue Ernest Solvay 24
B-1310 La Hulpe / BE
02 / VOLLMAR, Gerhard
Raiffeisenstrasse 12
D-67149 Meckenheim / DE
03 / GREULICH, Manuel
Kurpfalzhof 10
D-69124 Heidelberg / DE
04 / MILANOVIC, Raiko
Biethstrasse 20/1
D-69121 Heidelberg / DE
Representative(s)Miller, Toivo , et al
ABB Patent GmbH
Wallstadter Strasse 59
68526 Ladenburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/43]Miller, Toivo , et al
ABB Patent GmbH, Wallstadter Strasse 59
68526 Ladenburg / DE
Application number, filing date00906247.229.01.2000
[2002/43]
WO2000EP00713
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0155805
Date:02.08.2001
Language:DE
[2001/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1250632
Date:23.10.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2001
[2002/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1250632
Date:19.01.2005
Language:DE
[2005/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:G05B19/418
[2002/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/43]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERMITTLUNG DER PRODUKTIONSANLAGEN-EFFEKTIVITÄT, VON FEHLEREREIGNISSEN UND DER FEHLERURSACHEN[2002/43]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE OVERALL EQUIPMENT EFFECTIVENESS OF PRODUCTION PLANTS, FAILURE EVENTS AND FAILURE CAUSES[2002/43]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR DETERMINER L'EFFICACITE D'UNITES DE PRODUCTION, DES EVENEMENTS D'ERREURS ET LA CAUSE DESDITES ERREURS[2002/43]
Entry into regional phase06.07.2002National basic fee paid 
06.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
06.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.08.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/43]
14.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.07.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.11.2004Fee for grant paid
04.11.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIE19.01.2005
CY29.01.2005
AT31.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
GR19.04.2005
PT19.06.2005
[2008/03]
Former [2007/40]IE19.01.2005
CY29.01.2005
AT31.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
GR19.04.2005
Former [2007/20]IE19.01.2005
CY29.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
GR19.04.2005
Former [2006/14]IE19.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
GR19.04.2005
Former [2006/13]IE19.01.2005
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5067099  (MCCOWN PATRICIA M ET AL) [Y] 1-21 * column 5, line 24 - column 26, line 4; figures 1,5,6,18 *;
 [A]WO9915710  (ON LINE TECHN INC) [A] 1-21 * column A *;
 [A]EP0482522  (OSAKA GAS CO LTD ;UNIV VANDERBILT (US)) [A] 1-21 * column A *;
 [A]US5914879  (CHRISTIAN CRAIG WILLIAM ET AL) [A] 1-21 * column A *
 [Y]  - SRINIVASAN M ET AL, PERFORMANCE AND PRODUCTIVITY IMPROVEMENTS IN AN ADVANCED DIELECTRIC ETCH REACTOR FOR SUB 0.3UM APPLICATIONS, IEEE/SEMI ADVANCED SEMICONDUCTOR MANUFACTURING CONFERENCE AND WORKSHOP,US,NEW YORK, NY: IEEE, VOL. CONF. 9, PAGE(S) 419-422, ISBN 0-7803-4381-6, XP000850451 [Y] 1-21 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ASMC.1998.731639