Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1162921

EP1162921 - SYSTEM FOR GUIDING A DIAGNOSTIC OR THERAPEUTIC INSTRUMENT TOWARDS A TARGET REGION INSIDE THE PATIENT'S BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2001/51]A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR GUIDING A DIAGNOSTIC OR THERAPEUTIC INSTRUMENT TOWARDS A TARGET REGION INSIDE THE PATIENT'S BODY
[2004/24]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.02.2005
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.02.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.03.2005  [2005/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vtarget Ltd.
Hazait 238
17940 Mitzpe Adi / IL
[2001/51]
Inventor(s)01 / FRONT, Yaron
Mendel Zinger Street 11/24
34984 Haifa / IL
02 / BEN-DAVID, Gal
Hazait 238
17940 Mitzpe Adi / IL
 [2001/51]
Representative(s)Lampe, Sigmar
Dennemeyer & Associates S.A.
P.O. Box 1502
1015 Luxembourg / LU
[N/P]
Former [2003/48]Lampe, Sigmar
Dennemeyer & Associates s.a., P.O. Box 1502
1015 Luxembourg / LU
Former [2001/51]Schmitz, Jean-Marie , et al
Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502
1015 Luxembourg / LU
Application number, filing date00906576.422.02.2000
[2001/51]
WO2000IL00113
Priority number, dateUS1999025377922.02.1999         Original published format: US 253779
[2001/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0049958
Date:31.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1162921
Date:19.12.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2000
[2001/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61B19/00
[2001/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/51]
Extension statesAL09.08.2001
LT09.08.2001
LV09.08.2001
MK09.08.2001
RO09.08.2001
SI09.08.2001
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR FÜHRUNG EINES DIAGNOSTISCHEN ODER THERAPEUTISCHEN INSTRUMENTS ZU EINER ZIELREGION IM INNEREN EINES PATIENTENKÖRPERS[2004/24]
English:SYSTEM FOR GUIDING A DIAGNOSTIC OR THERAPEUTIC INSTRUMENT TOWARDS A TARGET REGION INSIDE THE PATIENT'S BODY[2004/24]
French:SYSTEME DE GUIDAGE D'INSTRUMENT THERAPEUTIQUE OU DE DIAGNOSTIC VERS UNE REGION CIBLE A L'INTERIEUR DU CORPS D'UN PATIENT[2004/24]
Former [2001/51]METHODE UND SYSTEM ZUR FÜHRUNG EINES DIAGNOSTISCHEN ODER THERAPEUTISCHEN INSTRUMENTS ZU EINER ZIELREGION IM INNEREN EINES PATIENTENKÖRPERS
Former [2001/51]A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR GUIDING A DIAGNOSTIC OR THERAPEUTIC INSTRUMENT TOWARDS A TARGET REGION INSIDE THE PATIENT'S BODY
Former [2001/51]PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE GUIDAGE D'INSTRUMENT THERAPEUTIQUE OU DE DIAGNOSTIC VERS UNE REGION CIBLE A L'INTERIEUR DU CORPS D'UN PATIENT
Entry into regional phase09.08.2001National basic fee paid 
09.08.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
09.08.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.09.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
09.08.2001Examination requested  [2001/51]
11.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.05.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.09.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/13]
28.10.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2005/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
18.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[YA]WO9835720  (BIOSENSE INC) [Y] 1-7,14,16-18 * the whole document * * page 20, line 1 - page 21, line 19 * * page 22, line 3 - page 24, line 9 * * page 24, line 19 - page 26, line 20 * * page 29, line 17 - line 26 * [A] 8,12,13,15;
 [YA]EP0728446  (CLEVELAND CLINIC FOUNDATION) [Y] 14,15 * the whole document * * column 1, line 21 - line 53 * * column 4, line 21 - column 6, line 38 * [A] 1,12,13,16;
 [YDA]US5376795  (LANG THOMAS F ET AL) [YD] 1-7,14-18 * the whole document * * claim 15 * [A] 9-11,21;
 [A]EP0676178  (CLEVELAND CLINIC FOUNDATION) [A] 1,12-15 * the whole document *
 [YDA]  - WEBER D A ET AL, "Correlative image registration", SEMINARS IN NUCLEAR MEDICINE, (199401), vol. XXIV, no. 1, pages 311 - 323, XP002901049 [YD] 1-7,14-18 * the whole document * * especially conclusion * [A] 9-11,21
 [YDA]  - LANG T F ET AL, "Description of a Prototype Emission - Transmission Computed Tomography Imaging System", THE JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, (199210), vol. 33, no. 10, pages 1881 - 1887, XP002901050 [YD] 1-7,14-18 * the whole document * * especially conclusion * [A] 9-11,21