blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1168900

EP1168900 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING MULTILAYER WIRING BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  19.11.2004
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2004Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 05.01.2005  [2005/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Daiwa Co., Ltd.
1-25, Shinmei-cho 4-chome Okaya-shi
Nagano-ken 394-0004 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/01]For all designated states
Daiwa Co., Ltd.
1-25, Shinmei-cho 4-chome
Okaya-shi, Nagano-ken 394-0004 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YOSHIMURA, Eiji Daiwa Co., Ltd.
1-25, Shinmei-cho 4-chome
Okaya-shi, Nagano 394-0004 / JP
02 / HIGUCHI, Toshiro
3-4-26, Edahigashi, Tuzuki-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 224-0006 / JP
 [2002/01]
Representative(s)Sajda, Wolf E., et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/01]Sajda, Wolf E., Dipl.-Phys., et al
MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date00906588.901.03.2000
[2002/01]
WO2000JP01186
Priority number, dateJP1999005573103.03.1999         Original published format: JP 5573199
JP1999011453822.04.1999         Original published format: JP 11453899
[2002/01]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0052977
Date:08.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1168900
Date:02.01.2002
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2002/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP08.09.2000
ClassificationIPC:H05K3/46
[2002/01]
CPC:
H05K3/4647 (EP,US); H05K3/46 (KR); B32B3/00 (US);
H05K2203/0384 (EP,US); H05K2203/0542 (EP,US); H05K2203/0733 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24917 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2004/20]
Former [2002/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR MEHRSCHICHTIGE VERDRAHTUNGSPLATTE[2002/01]
English:METHOD OF MANUFACTURING MULTILAYER WIRING BOARD[2002/01]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN PANNEAU DE CABLAGE MULTICOUCHE[2002/01]
Entry into regional phase02.10.2001Translation filed 
02.10.2001National basic fee paid 
02.10.2001Search fee paid 
02.10.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
02.10.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.09.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
02.10.2001Examination requested  [2002/01]
03.11.2004Application withdrawn by applicant  [2005/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]JPS58213451  (HITACHI LTD, et al);
 [Y]JPH05291744  (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD);
 [Y]JPH06216527  (HITACHI LTD);
 [Y]JPH06310857  (HITACHI LTD);
 [Y]JPH0710030B  ;
 [Y]JPH10135639  (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD, et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.