Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1160243

EP1160243 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING QUINAZOLINE DERIVATIVE OR SALT THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  16.05.2003
Database last updated on 17.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 01.10.2008  [2008/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.
4-7, Doshomachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-8514 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/49]For all designated states
FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.
4-7, Doshomachi 3-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8514 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / FUKAGAWA, Masayasu
48, Jinden, Kamiichimachi
Nakaniikawa-gun, Toyama 930-0365 / JP
02 / IEDA, Shigeru
5-1-1, Mukogaoka
Sanda-shi, Hyogo 669-1544 / JP
03 / TSUBOI, Hiroyuki
19-1, Ishizuminamimachi
Neyagawa-shi, Osaka 572-0024 / JP
04 / GOTO, Shunsuke
5-5-35-701, Nankounaka, Suminoe-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 559-0033 / JP
05 / KAGARA, Kooji
17-12, Onoharanishi 3-chome
Mino-shi, Osaka 562-0032 / JP
06 / UEMATSU, Ryoichi
2-62-107, Takamatsu-cho
Takarazuka-shi, Hyogo 665-0043 / JP
07 / NISIWAKI, Masanori
38-17, Hashimotonishikarimata
Yawata-shi, Kyoto 614-8334 / JP
 [2001/49]
Representative(s)Gille Hrabal
Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/40]Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos
Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2001/49]Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos
Patentanwälte, Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date00906739.806.03.2000
[2001/49]
WO2000JP01360
Priority number, dateJP1999006139009.03.1999         Original published format: JP 6139099
[2001/49]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0053584
Date:14.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1160243
Date:05.12.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2000
[2001/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.09.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:C07D239/96
[2001/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/49]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CHINAZOLINDERIVATEN ODER IHREN SALZEN[2001/49]
English:PROCESS FOR PRODUCING QUINAZOLINE DERIVATIVE OR SALT THEREOF[2001/49]
French:PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN DERIVE QUINAZOLINE OU D'UN SEL DE CE DERIVE[2001/49]
Entry into regional phase20.08.2001Translation filed 
22.08.2001National basic fee paid 
22.08.2001Search fee paid 
22.08.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
22.08.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.09.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
22.08.2001Examination requested  [2001/49]
13.05.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200304   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0456835  (KYORIN SEIYAKU KK [JP]) [X] 1-6 * page 3, line 18 - line 39; example 2 *;
 [X]DE19724983  (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-6 * exemple 2a) p.19 and Scheme V, p.12; page 11, line 51 - page 12, line 42 *;
 [X]DE4300912  (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-6 * page 5, line 57 - line 64 *;
 [X]EP0896961  (FUJI CHEM IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * page 11, line 26 - line 37; example 30 *;
 [A]  COTTAM H B ET AL, "SUBSTITUTED XANTHINES, PTERIDINEDIONES, AND RELATED COMPOUNDS AS POTENTIAL ANTIINFLAMMATORY AGENTS. SYNTHESIS AND BIOLOGICAL EVALUATION OF INHIBITORS OF TUMOR NECROSIS FACTOR ALPHA", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (1996), vol. 39, no. 1, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 2 - 9, XP000906858 [A] 1-6 * scheme 1,2,3. p.7, alkylation for compounds 4-8 (method A); page 3, column 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm940845j
International search[Y]EP0218999  (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]);
 [A]JPS6425767  (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO);
 [X]  - GOTO S. ET. AL., "A convenient synthesis of 1-substituted-2,4 (1H,3H) Quinozolinedione: industrial synthesis of zenarestat", CHEMISTRY EXPRESS (KINKI CHEMICAL SOCIETY, JAPAN), (1993), vol. 8, no. 9, pages 761 - 764, XP002928777
 [A]  - M. S. MALAMAS ET. AL., "Quinazolineacetic Acid and Related Analogues as Aldose Reductase Inhibitors", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1991), vol. 34, no. 4, pages 1492 - 1503, XP002928778

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00108a038