Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1256174 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1256174



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 219
12.10.2005 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
28.10.2004 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
07.10.2004 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
07.10.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 5
07.10.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 5
04.06.2004 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
04.06.2004 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
04.06.2004 Text intended for grant Search / examination 35
13.02.2004 Claims Search / examination 5
13.02.2004 Claims Search / examination 5
13.02.2004 Claims Search / examination 4
13.02.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
14.10.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
14.10.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.09.2003 Claims Search / examination 11
22.09.2003 Description Search / examination 1
22.09.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
12.08.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
12.08.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.10.2002 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
26.09.2002 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
20.09.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.08.2002 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
06.08.2002 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
18.09.2001 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
18.09.2001 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
18.09.2001 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
18.09.2001 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
18.09.2001 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
18.09.2001 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
18.09.2001 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
18.09.2001 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
31.08.2001 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
29.08.2001 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
29.08.2001 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
23.08.2001 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/404 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
22.08.2001 Invitation to correct defects in demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
22.08.2001 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
22.08.2001 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
17.08.2001 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
10.08.2001 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
10.08.2001 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
10.08.2001 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
10.08.2001 Submission concerning representation PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
09.08.2001 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
09.08.2001 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 40
24.03.2000 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
24.03.2000 Claims International Searching Authority 10
24.03.2000 Description International Searching Authority 23
24.03.2000 Drawings International Searching Authority 6