Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1161653

EP1161653 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR HIGH-SPEED LONGITUDINAL SCANNING IN IMAGING SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.07.2013
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lightlab Imaging
133, Littleton Road
Westford, MA 01886 / US
[2002/15]
Former [2002/14]For all designated states
Lightlab Imaging, LLC
133 Littleton Road
Westford, MA 01886 / US
Former [2001/50]For all designated states
Coherent Diagnodtic Technology, LLC
133, Littleton Road
Westford, MA 01886 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SWANSON, Eric, A.
13R Oakwood Road
Acton, MA 01720 / US
02 / PETERSEN, Christopher, L.
120 Evergreen Lane
Carlisle, MA 01741 / US
 [2001/50]
Representative(s)Brennan, Eimer Mary , et al
Cruickshank & Co.
8a Sandyford Business Centre
Sandyford
Dublin 18 / IE
[2012/38]
Former [2009/09]Brennan, Eimer Mary , et al
Cruickshank & Co. 8a Sandyford Business Centre Sandyford
Dublin 18 / IE
Former [2001/50]Clayton-Hathway, Anthony , et al
Fry, Heath & Spence The Old College 53 High Street
GB-Horley, Surrey RH6 7BN / GB
Application number, filing date00906886.720.01.2000
[2001/50]
WO2000US00488
Priority number, dateUS1999023342120.01.1999         Original published format: US 233421
[2001/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0043730
Date:27.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1161653
Date:12.12.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2000
[2001/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1161653
Date:19.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US27.07.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.09.2009
ClassificationInternational:G01B9/02, G01B11/24, G01N21/47
[2012/09]
Former International [2009/41]G01B9/02, A61B5/00
Former International [2001/50]G01B9/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/50]
Extension statesAL20.07.2001
LT20.07.2001
LV20.07.2001
MK20.07.2001
RO20.07.2001
SI20.07.2001
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND APPARAT FüR HOCHGESCHWINDIGKEITS LONGITUDINALABTASTUNG IN ABBILDUNGSSYSTEMEN.[2001/50]
English:METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR HIGH-SPEED LONGITUDINAL SCANNING IN IMAGING SYSTEMS[2001/50]
French:PROCEDES ET APPAREIL DE BALAYAGE LONGITUDINAL A GRANDE VITESSE DANS DES SYSTEMES D'IMAGERIE[2001/50]
Entry into regional phase20.07.2001National basic fee paid 
20.07.2001Search fee paid 
20.07.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
20.07.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.08.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
20.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/50]
10.09.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time
11.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.02.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.05.2012Fee for grant paid
14.05.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.05.2010
Opposition(s)20.06.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
20.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
26.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
20.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
27.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
29.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
10.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
30.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
25.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
25.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
25.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200809   M06   Fee paid on   31.07.2008
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.09.2012
BE19.09.2012
CY19.09.2012
DK19.09.2012
FI19.09.2012
IT19.09.2012
NL19.09.2012
SE19.09.2012
GR20.12.2012
ES30.12.2012
GB20.01.2013
IE20.01.2013
LU20.01.2013
PT21.01.2013
CH31.01.2013
FR31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2014/07]AT19.09.2012
BE19.09.2012
CY19.09.2012
DK19.09.2012
FI19.09.2012
IT19.09.2012
NL19.09.2012
SE19.09.2012
GR20.12.2012
ES30.12.2012
GB20.01.2013
IE20.01.2013
PT21.01.2013
CH31.01.2013
FR31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
Former [2013/51]AT19.09.2012
BE19.09.2012
CY19.09.2012
DK19.09.2012
FI19.09.2012
IT19.09.2012
NL19.09.2012
SE19.09.2012
GR20.12.2012
ES30.12.2012
GB20.01.2013
PT21.01.2013
CH31.01.2013
FR31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
Former [2013/50]AT19.09.2012
BE19.09.2012
CY19.09.2012
DK19.09.2012
FI19.09.2012
IT19.09.2012
NL19.09.2012
SE19.09.2012
GR20.12.2012
ES30.12.2012
PT21.01.2013
CH31.01.2013
FR31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
Former [2013/48]AT19.09.2012
BE19.09.2012
CY19.09.2012
DK19.09.2012
FI19.09.2012
IT19.09.2012
NL19.09.2012
SE19.09.2012
GR20.12.2012
ES30.12.2012
PT21.01.2013
CH31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
Former [2013/37]AT19.09.2012
BE19.09.2012
CY19.09.2012
DK19.09.2012
FI19.09.2012
IT19.09.2012
NL19.09.2012
SE19.09.2012
GR20.12.2012
ES30.12.2012
PT21.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
Former [2013/34]AT19.09.2012
BE19.09.2012
CY19.09.2012
DK19.09.2012
FI19.09.2012
NL19.09.2012
SE19.09.2012
GR20.12.2012
ES30.12.2012
PT21.01.2013
Former [2013/31]AT19.09.2012
BE19.09.2012
CY19.09.2012
FI19.09.2012
NL19.09.2012
SE19.09.2012
GR20.12.2012
ES30.12.2012
PT21.01.2013
Former [2013/28]BE19.09.2012
CY19.09.2012
FI19.09.2012
NL19.09.2012
SE19.09.2012
GR20.12.2012
ES30.12.2012
PT21.01.2013
Former [2013/22]BE19.09.2012
CY19.09.2012
FI19.09.2012
NL19.09.2012
SE19.09.2012
GR20.12.2012
ES30.12.2012
Former [2013/20]BE19.09.2012
CY19.09.2012
FI19.09.2012
SE19.09.2012
GR20.12.2012
Former [2013/12]CY19.09.2012
FI19.09.2012
SE19.09.2012
GR20.12.2012
Former [2013/11]CY19.09.2012
FI19.09.2012
GR20.12.2012
Former [2013/10]CY19.09.2012
FI19.09.2012
Former [2013/09]FI19.09.2012
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9732182  (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * page 7 - page 10 *;
 [A]US5491524  (HELLMUTH THOMAS [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * abstract *
International search[A]US4179219  (SMITH STANLEY T [US])
by applicantUS3776637
 JPS5824005
 US5387969
 US5007721
 US5033853