EP1161574 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ARC DEPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [2001/50] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IACOVANGELO, Charles, Dominic 1717 Dorwaldt Boulevard Schenectady, NY 12309 / US | 02 /
BORST, Keith, Milton 392 West Glenville Road Scotia, NY 12302 / US | 03 /
JERABEK, Elihu, Calvin 504 Feura Bush Road Glenmont, NY 12077 / US | 04 /
MARZANO, Patrick, Peter 3 Maurice Lane Clifton Park, NY 12065 / US | 05 /
YANG, Barry, Lee-Mean 3 Algonquin Road Clifton Park, NY 12065 / US | [2001/50] | Representative(s) | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | Szary, Anne Catherine, Dr., et al London Patent Operation, GE International, Inc., Essex House, 12-13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00907176.2 | 04.02.2000 | [2001/50] | WO2000US03028 | Priority number, date | US19990271655 | 17.03.1999 Original published format: US 271655 | [2001/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0055388 | Date: | 21.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1161574 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1161574 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/50, B05B7/22, C23C14/22, C23C14/24 | [2001/50] | CPC: |
C23C14/228 (EP,US);
C23C14/32 (EP,US);
C23C16/513 (EP,US);
H01J37/32422 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BESCHICHTEN MITTELS BOGENENTLADUNG | [2001/50] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ARC DEPOSITION | [2001/50] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE DEPOT A L'ARC | [2001/50] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/50] | 04.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.12.2003 | BE | 17.12.2003 | CH | 17.12.2003 | CY | 17.12.2003 | FI | 17.12.2003 | IT | 17.12.2003 | LI | 17.12.2003 | NL | 17.12.2003 | IE | 04.02.2004 | LU | 04.02.2004 | MC | 28.02.2004 | DK | 17.03.2004 | GR | 17.03.2004 | SE | 17.03.2004 | ES | 28.03.2004 | PT | 17.05.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 17.12.2003 | |
BE | 17.12.2003 | ||
CH | 17.12.2003 | ||
CY | 17.12.2003 | ||
FI | 17.12.2003 | ||
IT | 17.12.2003 | ||
LI | 17.12.2003 | ||
NL | 17.12.2003 | ||
IE | 04.02.2004 | ||
LU | 04.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
DK | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.03.2004 | ||
SE | 17.03.2004 | ||
ES | 28.03.2004 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 17.12.2003 | |
BE | 17.12.2003 | ||
CH | 17.12.2003 | ||
CY | 17.12.2003 | ||
FI | 17.12.2003 | ||
LI | 17.12.2003 | ||
NL | 17.12.2003 | ||
IE | 04.02.2004 | ||
LU | 04.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
DK | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.03.2004 | ||
SE | 17.03.2004 | ||
ES | 28.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 17.12.2003 | |
BE | 17.12.2003 | ||
CH | 17.12.2003 | ||
FI | 17.12.2003 | ||
LI | 17.12.2003 | ||
NL | 17.12.2003 | ||
IE | 04.02.2004 | ||
LU | 04.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
DK | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.03.2004 | ||
SE | 17.03.2004 | ||
ES | 28.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/19] | AT | 17.12.2003 | |
BE | 17.12.2003 | ||
CH | 17.12.2003 | ||
FI | 17.12.2003 | ||
LI | 17.12.2003 | ||
NL | 17.12.2003 | ||
IE | 04.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
DK | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.03.2004 | ||
SE | 17.03.2004 | ||
ES | 28.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 17.12.2003 | |
BE | 17.12.2003 | ||
CH | 17.12.2003 | ||
FI | 17.12.2003 | ||
LI | 17.12.2003 | ||
NL | 17.12.2003 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
DK | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.03.2004 | ||
SE | 17.03.2004 | ||
ES | 28.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | AT | 17.12.2003 | |
BE | 17.12.2003 | ||
CH | 17.12.2003 | ||
FI | 17.12.2003 | ||
LI | 17.12.2003 | ||
NL | 17.12.2003 | ||
GR | 17.03.2004 | ||
SE | 17.03.2004 | ||
ES | 28.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 17.12.2003 | |
CH | 17.12.2003 | ||
FI | 17.12.2003 | ||
LI | 17.12.2003 | ||
NL | 17.12.2003 | ||
GR | 17.03.2004 | ||
SE | 17.03.2004 | ||
ES | 28.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 17.12.2003 | |
CH | 17.12.2003 | ||
FI | 17.12.2003 | ||
LI | 17.12.2003 | ||
NL | 17.12.2003 | ||
GR | 17.03.2004 | ||
SE | 17.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 17.12.2003 | |
FI | 17.12.2003 | ||
SE | 17.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 17.12.2003 | |
SE | 17.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 17.03.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3625848 (SNAPER ALVIN A) [A] 1-46,48-53* figure 1 *; | [XAY]DE3014258 (WINTER HEINRICH DR) [X] 1,3 * page 7, line 1 - line 20 * * page 10, line 7 - line 11 * [A] 7,8,23 [Y] 29-37,43,44; | [Y]EP0293229 (INCO LTD [CA]) [Y] 48-53 * column 3, line 23 - line 45; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0617142 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-46,48-53 * figure 1; example 1 *; | [XY]US5571332 (HALPERN BRET [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6,21,26,28 * column 5, line 11 - column 7, line 2 * * column 10, line 23 - column 11, line 2; figures 3-5 * [Y] 4,9-13,17-22,29-38,43,44,48-53; | [XY]EP0887437 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 27 * page 5, line 43 - line 46 * * page 6, line 14 - line 16 * [Y] 4,9-13,17-22; | [A]EP0887110 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 29-36,48-53 * page 3, line 28 - line 52; figures 1,2 *; | [Y] - RAO N ET AL, "NANOPARTICLE FORMATION USING A PLASMA EXPANSION PROCESS", PLASMA CHEMISTRY AND PLASMA PROCESSING,US,PLENUM PRESS. NEW YORK, (19951201), vol. 15, no. 4, ISSN 0272-4324, pages 581 - 606, XP000539562 [Y] 29,37,38 * page 587, line 8 - line 14; figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01447062 |